Leonard v. Nike, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kawhi Leonard
Defendant: Nike Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01586
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 53 Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan . Filed by Kawhi Leonard. (Koslof, Nathaniel)
November 14, 2019 Filing 52 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephone Status Conference held. Parties to submit a Joint Proposed Case Schedule. Mitchell Stein, Nathaniel Koslof, Peter Ginsberg, Renee Rothauge present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Tamar Duvdevani, John Casey present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. Judge Michael W. Mosman presiding. (kms)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman. The Status Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 09:00AM will now be by telephone at 9:00AM. The parties are to call the conference line. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman. The Early Neutral Evaluation set for 11/15/2019 01:30PM is STRICKEN. Status Conference is set for 11/14/2019 at 09:00AM in Portland Courtroom 16 before Judge Michael W. Mosman. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
October 28, 2019 Filing 49 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Nathaniel R. B. Koslof (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: nrbkoslof. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nathaniel R. B. Koslof for Kawhi Leonard. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6048095 issued. Signed on 10/28/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ecp)
October 28, 2019 Filing 47 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Mitchell C. Stein (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: mcstein. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mitchell C. Stein for Kawhi Leonard. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6048086. issued. Signed on 10/28/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ecp)
October 28, 2019 Filing 45 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Peter R. Ginsberg (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: prginsberg. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter R. Ginsberg for Kawhi Leonard. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6048068 issued. Signed on 10/28/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ecp)
October 21, 2019 Filing 43 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nathaniel R. B. Koslof . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6048095. Filed by Kawhi Leonard. (Rothauge, Renee)
October 21, 2019 Filing 42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mitchell C. Stein . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6048086. Filed by Kawhi Leonard. (Rothauge, Renee)
October 21, 2019 Filing 41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Peter R. Ginsberg . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6048068. Filed by Kawhi Leonard. (Rothauge, Renee)
October 17, 2019 Filing 40 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Tamar Duvdevani (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: tduvdevani. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (sss)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice Tamar Duvdevani appearing for Defendant Nike, Inc. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6039628 issued. Signed on 10/16/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (sss)
October 16, 2019 Filing 38 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Matthew Ganas (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: mganas. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (sss)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice Matthew Ganas appearing for Defendant Nike, Inc. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6039648 issued. Signed on 10/16/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (sss)
October 15, 2019 Filing 36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew Ganas . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6039648. Filed by Nike Inc. (Casey, B.)
October 15, 2019 Filing 35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tamar Y. Duvdevani . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6039628. Filed by Nike Inc. (Casey, B.)
October 15, 2019 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance of Tyler J. Killeen appearing on behalf of Nike Inc Filed by on behalf of Nike Inc. (Killeen, Tyler)
October 15, 2019 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance of B. John Casey appearing on behalf of Nike Inc Filed by on behalf of Nike Inc. (Casey, B.)
October 3, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE TO NON-ADMITTED COUNSEL: This case has been transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon from the Southern District of California. Our records indicate that you are not admitted to practice in the District of Oregon. Admissions information is governed by #LR 83, and information about the admissions process is available on the #admissions page of the Court website. Related Document Case Transferred In - District Transfer #31 . (eo)
October 3, 2019 Filing 31 Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:19-cv-01035. Electronic file received.
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting Defendant's #17 MOTION to Change Venue. Case transferred to the District of Oregon. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Oregon*.*100 Southwest Third Avenue, Room 740**Portland, OR 97204-2802*. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 10/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order) (jah) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting #14 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. The Court finds compelling reasons to seal portions of the contract. Therefore, the Court grants Defendant's Motion to Seal. The Court directs the Clerk to accept and file under seal the requested document. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 9/27/2019. (rmc) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Nike, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tamar Duvdevani, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Tamar Duvdevani, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Tamar Duvdevani)(Duvdevani, Tamar). (jah). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to #16 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Kawhi Leonard.(Ginsberg, Peter) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 25 PRO HAC APPROVED re #22 : Nathaniel R. B. Koslof appearing for Plaintiff Kawhi Leonard, Counter Defendant Kawhi Leonard. (no document attached) (mdc) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 24 PRO HAC APPROVED re #21 : Mitchell C. Stein appearing for Plaintiff Kawhi Leonard, Counter Defendant Kawhi Leonard. (no document attached) (mdc) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Kawhi Leonard. (Ginsberg, Peter). (jah). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 22 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12870425.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Koslof, Nathaniel) (mdc) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 21 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12870388.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Stein, Mitchell) (mdc) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #16 Counterclaim; granting #19 Joint Motion for Adjournment of #17 MOTION to Change Venue. Counter-Defendant Kawhi Leonard shall answer to the Counterclaim by 8/28/2019. Defendant's motion to transfer venue #17 is noticed for 9/9/2019. The briefing schedule for the motion is set pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1.(e). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 8/6/2019. (jah) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #16 Counterclaim, Joint MOTION for Adjournment of #17 MOTION to Change Venue by Kawhi Leonard. (Ginsberg, Peter). Added MOTION on 8/5/2019. Modified on 8/5/2019 - Multi part motion, one part not filed. Corrected entry (jah). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 11/15/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Rule 26(f) conference shall be completed by 10/17/2019. Joint Discovery Plan shall be filed in CM/ECF as well as lodged with Magistrate Judge Skomal by 11/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/22/2019. (jah) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Change Venue by Nike, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Dinusha Welliver, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Dinusha Welliver, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Dinusha Welliver, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Dinusha Welliver)(Duvdevani, Tamar). (jah). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Kawhi Leonard by Nike, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted), #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Duvdevani, Tamar).Modified on 7/28/2019 - Missing caption for Counterclaim (jah). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 15 ** Filed as Sealed Document 29 on 9/27/2019 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #14 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Duvdevani, Tamar) (rmc). (Main Document 15 replaced on 9/27/2019) (rmc). Modified on 9/27/2019 to add file date of lodgment (rmc). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Duvdevani, Tamar) (rmc). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter R. Ginsberg on behalf of Kawhi Leonard (Ginsberg, Peter). Attorney Peter R. Ginsberg added to party Kawhi Leonard (pty:pla). (jah). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant Nike, Inc. answer due 7/17/2019. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/24/2019. (jah) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Nike, Inc.. (Panikowski, Stanley). (jah). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nike, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Panikowski, Stanley). (jah). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 PRO HAC APPROVED: Tamar Duvdevani appearing for Defendant Nike, Inc. (no document attached) (dsn) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 PRO HAC APPROVED: Matthew Nicholas Ganas appearing for Defendant Nike, Inc. (no document attached) (dsn) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12640757.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Ganas, Matthew) (tcf). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12640727.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Duvdevani, Tamar) (tcf). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stanley J Panikowski, III on behalf of Nike, Inc. (Panikowski, Stanley)Attorney Stanley J Panikowski, III added to party Nike, Inc.(pty:dft) (tcf). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kawhi Leonard. Nike, Inc. served. (Metzger, Scott). (jah). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William Patrick Keith on behalf of Kawhi Leonard (Keith, William). Attorney William Patrick Keith added to party Kawhi Leonard (pty:pla). (jah). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Nike, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12576371.), filed by Kawhi Leonard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copyright Form) [Copyright Form Mailed]The new case number is 3:19-cv-1035-BAS-BGS. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Metzger, Scott)(jrm) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/3/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonard v. Nike, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kawhi Leonard
Represented By: Peter R. Ginsberg
Represented By: Nathaniel R. B. Koslof
Represented By: Mitchell C. Stein
Represented By: William Patrick Keith
Represented By: Scott L Metzger
Represented By: Renee E. Rothauge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nike Inc
Represented By: Tamar Duvdevani
Represented By: Matthew Nicholas Ganas
Represented By: Stanley J. Panikowski
Represented By: Matthew Ganas
Represented By: Tyler J. Killeen
Represented By: B. John Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?