Moradi et al v. ReconTrust Company, NA et al
Plaintiff: Homa Moradi and Kambiz Moradi
Defendant: John Does 1-20, ReconTrust Company, NA, Bank of America, NA and The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 3:2019cv01590
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Referring Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 25 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Plaintiff Homa Moradi regarding Order 24 . (gm)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #23 as follows: Defendants' reply to response to motion to dismiss due by 12/16/2019. Order: Resetting Defendants ReconTrust Company, Bank of America and Bank of New York Mellon's Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss #8 and Request for Judicial Notice #9 from 11/25/2019 to the the under advisement calendar of 12/23/2019. (gm)
November 25, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #8 . Filed by Bank of America, NA, ReconTrust Company, NA, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Laurick, James)
November 20, 2019 Filing 22 Response to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #8 . Filed by Homa Moradi, Kambiz Moradi. (Moradi, Kambiz)
November 19, 2019 Filing 21 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Discovery order, #6 sent to Kambiz Moradi returned as undeliverable. (ecp)
November 14, 2019 Filing 20 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Plaintiff Homa Moradi regarding Order 19 . (gm)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: The Court notes that plaintiffs have twice sought extensions of time to respond to defendants' pending motion to dismiss #8 , but then failed to file any opposition by the requested deadline. Accordingly, plaintiffs shall have until 11/20/2019 to respond to the motion to dismiss. If no response is filed by that date, the Court will treat defendants' motion as unopposed. (gm)
November 13, 2019 Filing 18 Declaration in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Request for Judicial Notice. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (ecp)
November 4, 2019 Filing 17 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Discovery order, #6 , Case Reassignment Notice #7 sent to Homa Moradi and Kambiz Moradi returned as undeliverable. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (ecp)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Plaintiff's Letter Request/Motion for Extension of Time #15 as follows: Plaintiffs' response to motion to dismiss due by 11/5/2019. Defendants' reply to response to motion to dismiss due by 11/19/2019. Order: Resetting Defendants ReconTrust Company, Bank of America and Bank of New York Mellon's Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss #8 and Request for Judicial Notice #9 from 11/12/2019 to the the under advisement calendar of 11/25/2019. (gm)
November 1, 2019 Filing 15 Motion for Extension of Time submitted in the form of a letter. Filed by Kambiz Moradi. (ecp)
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Kambiz Z. Moradi (Pro Se Filer admission). Your login is: kmoradi. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting Plaintiff Kambiz Moradi's Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party (CM/ECF Registered User) #12 . Signed on 10/31/19 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/31/19.) (gm)
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party. Filed by Kambiz Moradi. (ecp)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Setting Defendants ReconTrust Company, Bank of America and Bank of New York Mellon's Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss #8 and Request for Judicial Notice #9 on the under advisement calendar of 11/12/2019. Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' motion to dismiss due by 10/24/2019. Defendants' reply to Plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss due by 11/7/2019. NOTICE: A dispositive motion has been filed in this case. If the parties would like to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, the consent form may be found on the court's website (https://ord.uscourts.gov/civil-forms), and may be filed electronically under the Civil Event "Other Filings/Consents," or sent via mail or hand delivered to the Clerk's Office. For more information regarding the role of magistrate judges and consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction, see https://ord.uscourts.gov/consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/10/19.) (gm)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 Declaration of James P. Laurick in Support of Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice. Filed by Bank of America, NA, ReconTrust Company, NA, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Related document(s): Request for Judicial Notice #9 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #8 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Laurick, James)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Judicial Notice Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #8 . Filed by Bank of America, NA, ReconTrust Company, NA, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Laurick, James)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Filed by Bank of America, NA, ReconTrust Company, NA, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Laurick, James)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/8/19.) (eo)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 2/3/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/2/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 3/2/2020. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (Mailed to Pro Se parties on 10/4/2019.) (joha)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by ReconTrust Company, NA. (Laurick, James)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon. (Laurick, James)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Bank of America, NA. (Laurick, James)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Notice re Notice of Removal, #1 Consent to Removal Filed by Bank of America, NA, ReconTrust Company, NA, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Laurick, James)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV36500 from Washington County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6027947 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by ReconTrust Company, NA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Laurick, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moradi et al v. ReconTrust Company, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homa Moradi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kambiz Moradi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ReconTrust Company, NA
Represented By: James P. Laurick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, NA
Represented By: James P. Laurick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: James P. Laurick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?