Smith et al v. C. R. Bard, Inc.
Plaintiff: Becky Smith and Donald Mackie
Defendant: C. R. Bard, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01635
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE TO NON-ADMITTED COUNSEL: This case has been transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon from the Southern District of West Virginia (Charleston). Our records indicate that you are not admitted to practice in the District of Oregon. Admissions information is governed by #LR 83, and information about the admissions process is available on the #admissions page of the Court website. Related Document Case Transferred In - District Transfer #54 . (eo)
October 11, 2019 Filing 54 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:15-cv-16402. Electronic file received.
October 9, 2019 Filing 53 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:10-md-02187 - C. R. Bard, Inc. (Buhr, Eric) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A It is DIRECTED that on 10/10/2019 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 10/9/2019 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/26/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2187; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 51 REPLY by C. R. Bard, Inc. to #48 MEMORANDUM in opposition. (Buhr, Eric) (Modified on 9/17/2019 to add link to #48 memorandum and remove link to #44 motion) (msa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 50 REPLY by C. R. Bard, Inc. to #47 Memorandum In Opposition. (Buhr, Eric) (Modified on 9/17/2019 to remove link to #42 motion and #43 memorandum in support) (msa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM by C. R. Bard, Inc. in opposition to #46 MOTION by Donald Mackie, Becky Smith to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Thomas Giudice, M.D. and Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Buhr, Eric) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM by Donald Mackie, Becky Smith in opposition to #44 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Exclude or Limit Certain Opinions And Testimony Of Daniel S. Elliott, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Scarcello, Lindsey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM by Donald Mackie, Becky Smith in opposition to #42 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Summary Judgment, or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Cartmell, Thomas) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION by Donald Mackie, Becky Smith to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Thomas Giudice, M.D. and MEMORANDUM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Scarcello, Lindsey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by C. R. Bard, Inc. in support of #44 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Exclude or Limit Certain Opinions And Testimony Of Daniel S. Elliott, M.D. (Buhr, Eric) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. to Exclude or Limit Certain Opinions And Testimony Of Daniel S. Elliott, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Buhr, Eric) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by C. R. Bard, Inc. in support of #42 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment. (Buhr, Eric) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION by C. R. Bard, Inc. for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 to 7)(Buhr, Eric) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Donald Mackie, Becky Smith of Thomas Giudice, M.D. on August 7, 2019 at 4:00 p.m. (Scarcello, Lindsey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS by Donald Mackie, Becky Smith to Defendant's Amended Notice of Deposition of Plaintiff Becky Smith. (Scarcello, Lindsey) (Modified on 6/13/2019 to convert event to response in opposition) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Laurence Mandell on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Mandell, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald Mackie, Becky Smith for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Scarcello, Lindsey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 37 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Donald Mackie, Becky Smith of Dr. Mary Anna Denman on June 13, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. (Scarcello, Lindsey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 36 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Donald Mackie, Becky Smith of Dr. Jin-Hee Kim on June 13, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (Scarcello, Lindsey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Donald Mackie, Becky Smith of Dr. Mary Anna Denman on TBD at TBD (Scarcello, Lindsey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Donald Mackie, Becky Smith of Dr. Jin-Hee Kim on TBD at TBD (Scarcello, Lindsey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher M. Butler on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Butler, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Lindsey Scarcello on behalf of Donald Mackie, Becky Smith. (Scarcello, Lindsey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
April 13, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Eric J. Buhr on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Buhr, Eric) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald Mackie, Becky Smith for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents, and Requests for Admission. (Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 29 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Becky Smith. (Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PRETRIAL ORDER # 299 (Docket Control Order - C. R. Bard Wave 9 Cases) The cases on Exhibit A are: 1. removed from the pending inactive docket; and 2. placed on the active docket. As to the cases on Exhibits A and B: 1. The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; 2. To the extent other defendants, in addition to C. R. Bard and Sofradim Production SAS, Tissue Science Laboratories and Covidien entities, are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; 3. The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in the main MDL, every case listed on Exhibits A and B (hereinafter referred to as Wave 9 cases) becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order.; and 4. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 9 cases with one important exception. If any of the cases on any exhibit were previously on a docket control order and dispositive and Daubert deadlines had passed before such cases became inactive, the parties may not file or refile dispositive or Daubert motions without first seeking leave of court for good cause shown. A. SCHEDULING DEADLINES.. The following deadlines shall apply in all Bard Wave 9 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 02/15/2019; Defendant Fact Sheets due 02/22/2019; Deadline for written discovery requests due 03/25/2019; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due 05/24/2019; Expert disclosure served by defendants due 06/24/2019; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due 07/01/2019; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due 08/01/2019; Filing of dispositive motions due 08/14/2019; Response to dispositive motions due 08/28/2019; Reply to response to dispositive motions due 09/04/2019; Filing of Daubert motions due 08/14/2019; Responses to Daubert motions due 08/29/2019; Reply to response to Daubert motions due 09/05/2019. B. MOTION PRACTICE. 3. Confidential Documents. Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 6/27/2019, and any response is due by 7/11/2019. Any reply is due by 7/18/2019. The court expects full compliance with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 26.4(c). C. CASES READY FOR TRANSFER, REMAND OR TRIAL 1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 7/8/2019, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/4/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2187; Bard Wave 9 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (kab) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2187 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2187 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2187; Cases on inactive docket) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL Bard Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL Bard Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2187; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL Bard Inactive") (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 8/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2187 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2187 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2187; Cases on inactive docket) (rec) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
March 7, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE OF REQUEST TO BE REMOVED FROM THE COURT'S SERVICE LIST by Danny L. Curtis on behalf of Becky Smith (Curtis, Danny) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and C. R. Bard have reached a settlement with regard to Bard. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to retire this case from the active docket. Plaintiff(s) and Bard may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 3/31/2018; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties shows good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 4847 in MDL Case No. 2187 Bard. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/29/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PRETRIAL ORDER #263 (Sixth Amended Docket Control Order - Wave 4 Cases, Third Amended Docket Control Order - Wave 5 Cases) On 9/8/2017, a Stipulation and Order to Extend Deadlines in Wave 4 and 5 Cases was entered in MDL 2187. This Docket Control Order does not change any of the deadlines stipulated in the Order, but rather allows those deadlines to be made public as a docket control order on the courts website and to be filed in the designated Wave 4 and Wave 5 cases. The following remaining deadlines shall apply in the Bard Wave 4 and Wave 5 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines Wave 4. The following deadlines shall apply in the Bard Wave 4 cases. All other deadlines and requirements as set forth in Pretrial Order No. 261 remain in effect for Bard Wave 4 cases: Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2017, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2017, Reply to Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/12/2017, Filing of Daubert Motions due by 9/28/2017, Responses to Daubert Motions due by 10/12/2017, and Reply to Response to Daubert Motions due by 10/19/2017. B. Scheduling Deadlines Wave 5. The following deadlines shall apply in the Bard Wave 5 cases. All other deadlines and requirements as set forth in Pretrial Order No. 262 remain in effect for Bard Wave 5 cases: Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/22/2017, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/06/2017, Reply to Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/13/2017, Filing of Daubert Motions due by 9/29/2017, Responses to Daubert Motions due by 10/13/2017, and Reply to Response to Daubert Motions due by 10/20/2017. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/20/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys) (REF: MDL 2187; Wave 4 and 5 Cases) (brn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PRETRIAL ORDER # 262 (Second Amended Docket Control Order Wave 5 Cases) This Docket Control Order does not change any of the stipulated deadlines contained in the Order filed at ECF No. 4460 in MDL 2187, but rather allows the deadlines to show as a docket control order on the court's website and to be filed in the designated Wave 5 cases. The following remaining deadlines shall apply in the Bard Wave 5 cases: SCHEDULING DEADLINES: The following deadlines shall apply in the Bard Wave 5 cases: Defendant Fact Sheets due by 05/03/2017, deadline for written discovery requests due by 06/27/2017, expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 06/12/2017, expert disclosure by defendants due by 07/12/2017, expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 07/28/2017, deposition deadline and close of discovery including corporate discovery due by 08/11/2017, filing of Dispositive Motions due by 09/12/2017, response to Dispositive Motions due by 09/26/2017, reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/03/2017, filing of Daubert motions due by 09/19/2017, responses to Daubert motions due by 10/03/2017, and reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/10/2017. Confidential Documents: In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: A consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 7/14/2017, any response is due 7/28/2017 and any reply is due by 8/4/2017. Venue Recommendations: By no later than 6/12/2017, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties shall file joint venue recommendations in MDL 2187 no later than 6/22/2017. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/1/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys) (REF: MDL 2187; Wave 5 Cases) (kab) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
July 6, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by C. R. Bard, Inc. of #16 Amended Notice of Deposition of Jin-Hee Kim, M.D. (Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
June 27, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena to Jin-Hee Kim, M.D. by Becky Smith re: #16 Amended Notice of Deposition of Jin-Hee Kim, M.D. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
June 2, 2017 Filing 18 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Becky Smith. (Cartmell, Thomas) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
June 2, 2017 Filing 17 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Becky Smith. (Cartmell, Thomas) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
May 18, 2017 Filing 16 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by C. R. Bard, Inc. of Jin-Hee Kim, MD on July 11, 2017 at 5:00 pm (Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
May 16, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by C. R. Bard, Inc. of #11 Notice of Deposition of Jin-Hee Kim, M.D. (Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
May 8, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Sarah Barrows on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Barrows, Sarah) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
April 24, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Danny L. Curtis on behalf of Donald Mackie, Becky Smith. (Curtis, Danny) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
April 20, 2017 Filing 12 RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS to #9 Notice of Deposition of Donald Mackie by Donald Mackie, Becky Smith (Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
April 13, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by C. R. Bard, Inc. of Jin-Hee Kim, M.D. on May 23, 2017 at 6:30 pm (Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
April 10, 2017 Filing 10 RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS to #8 Notice of Deposition of Becky Smith by Becky Smith (Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
April 4, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by C. R. Bard, Inc. of Donald Mackie on April 24, 2017 at 2:00 pm (Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
April 4, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by C. R. Bard, Inc. of Becky Smith on April 24, 2017 at 10:00 am (Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
March 30, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Leah P. Collins on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Collins, Leah) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
March 17, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Daniel I.A. Smulian on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Smulian, Daniel) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
March 14, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Lori G. Cohen on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Cohen, Lori) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDER # 244 (Docket Control Order - Wave 5 Cases) The cases, attached hereto as Exhibit A, will be known as the Bard Wave 5 cases, and the following deadlines shall apply in the Bard Wave 5 cases: Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 4/03/2017, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 5/03/2017, Deadline for written discovery requests is 6/27/2017, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/12/2017, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/12/2017, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/28/2017, Deposition deadline and close of discovery including corporate discovery due by 8/11/2017, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2017, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 9/14/2017, Reply to Response to Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2017, Filing of Daubert Motions due by 9/07/2017, Responses to Daubert Motions due by 9/21/2017, and Reply to Response to Daubert motions due by 9/28/2017. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the courts attention in a consolidated manner as follows: A consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 7/14/2017, any response is due 7/28/2017 and any reply is due 8/04/2017. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 6/12/2017, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties shall file joint venue recommendations in MDL 2187 no later than 6/22/2017. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/3/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys) (REF: MDL 2187; Wave 5 cases) (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
February 15, 2016 Filing 3 AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT filed by Becky Smith, Donald Mackie against C. R. Bard, Inc. ("Bard"). (Kuntz, Jeffrey) (Modified on 2/15/2016 to add party filer) (skh). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
December 23, 2015 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 206 (ORDER RE: RCRSD AND COVIDIEN QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND) entered on 12/22/2015 in MDL 2187 to attorneys in member case. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]
December 22, 2015 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-4300806. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. C. R. Bard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Smith
Represented By: Thomas P. Cartmell
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Kuntz
Represented By: Danny L. Curtis
Represented By: Lindsey Scarcello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Mackie
Represented By: Thomas P. Cartmell
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Kuntz
Represented By: Danny L. Curtis
Represented By: Lindsey Scarcello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Lori G. Cohen
Represented By: Christopher M. Butler
Represented By: Daniel I.A. Smulian
Represented By: Leah P. Collins
Represented By: Michael Laurence Mandell
Represented By: Eric J. Buhr
Represented By: Sarah Barrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?