Bank Of New York Mellon v. Wills
Plaintiff: Bank Of New York Mellon
Defendant: Lucille Wills
Case Number: 3:2019cv01650
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The notice of removal is deficient in that a plaintiff cannot remove a state court action to federal court. To the extent that the "complaint" attached to the notice of removal can be construed as a new complaint filed with this court, it is also deficient for the reasons discussed above. By December 10, 2019, plaintiff shall show cause in writing why this action should not be dismissed. Alternatively, by that date, plaintiff may file an amended complaint and amended application to proceed in forma pauperis curing the defects identified above.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 11/19/2019 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/19/2019.) (pvh)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice to Self-Represented Litigants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/22/2019.) (pvh)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Lucille Wills regarding Case Assignment Notice #3 . (ecp)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Lucille Wills. (ecp)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19LT13119 from Multnomah County Circuit Court.. Filed by Lucille Wills (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (ecp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank Of New York Mellon v. Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucille Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank Of New York Mellon
Represented By: Kimberly Hood
Represented By: Shannon K. Calt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?