Benaron v. Simic
Plaintiff: Lisa Benaron
Defendant: Brett Simic
Case Number: 3:2019cv01653
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 Declaration of Alexander H. Hill In Support of Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Brett Simic. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction #3 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Hill, Alexander)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #3 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Brett Simic. (Hill, Alexander)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 Declaration of Robert B. Parker ISO Pltf Resp in Opposition to Mtn to Dismiss. Filed by Lisa Benaron. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #4 .) (Parker, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #3 . Filed by Lisa Benaron. (Parker, Robert)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Brett Simic. (Bernstein, Lloyd)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 2/13/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/16/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 3/16/2020. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (joha)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV25869 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6040055 issued.. Filed by Brett Simic (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Bernstein, Lloyd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benaron v. Simic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Benaron
Represented By: Robert Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Simic
Represented By: Lloyd Bernstein
Represented By: Alexander H. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?