Salish Skajet Kwabacabs Tribal Republic et al v. Bank Of New York Mellon et al
Plaintiff: Lucille Wills, Salish Skajet Kwabacabs Tribal Republic, William X. Nietzche, William Kinney, Jr. and Julie Ann Metcalf Kinney
Defendant: Roman Ozeruga, Michael H. Simon, Mark K. Passanante, Bank Of New York Mellon, John G. Aldridge, Terrance Slominski, Urban Housing Development, Stephen Bushong, Amy Baggio, Robert S. Phed, Lawrence Randell Weisberg and Tom Purcell
Case Number: 3:2019cv01670
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Referring Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/9/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/11/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 5/11/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 12/12/2019.) (ecp)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Application for Leave to Proceed IFP #1 is DENIED as moot. Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to file First Amended Complaint #8 is GRANTED. The deadline for Plaintiffs to file their First Amended Complaint is 01/08/2020. Upon filing their First Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs are order to serve the Defendants in compliance with Rules 4 and 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time #7 is DENIED as moot. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 12/10/19.) (dls)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Extension of Time Titled as "Plaintiff's 2nd Notice of Extension of Time to File its First Amended Complaint". Filed by Salish Skajet Kwabacabs Tribal Republic. (ecp)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for Extension of Time. Filed as "Notice of Extension of Time" Filed by William X. Nietzche. (ecp)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/24/19.) (eo)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to Consolidate (Titled as Notice to Consolidate). Filed by William X. Nietzche. (ecp)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/18/2019.) (joha)
October 18, 2019 Filing fee in amount of $400.00 collected; Receipt No. 86036 issued. (re)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Amended Action. Filed by William X. Nietzche. (joha)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by William X. Nietzche, Salish Skajet Kwabacabs Tribal Republic, William Kinney, Jr, Julie Ann Metcalf Kinney, Lucille Wills against John G. Aldridge, Amy Baggio, Bank Of New York Mellon, Stephen Bushong, Roman Ozeruga, Mark K. Passanante, Robert S. Phed, Tom Purcell, Michael H. Simon, Terrance Slominski, Urban Housing Development, Lawrence Randell Weisberg (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (joha)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by William X. Nietzche. (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salish Skajet Kwabacabs Tribal Republic et al v. Bank Of New York Mellon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Ozeruga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael H. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark K. Passanante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John G. Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance Slominski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urban Housing Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Bushong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Baggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S. Phed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Randell Weisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucille Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salish Skajet Kwabacabs Tribal Republic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William X. Nietzche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Kinney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Ann Metcalf Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?