Dwfritz Automation Inc. et al v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Gaurav Bathija and Dwfritz Automation Inc.
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and Kathy Baran
Case Number: 3:2019cv01675
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the parties' joint motion #8 . All deadlines in this matter are stayed until Defendants' issuance of a final decision, or until April 15, 2020, whichever is sooner. See attached order for more details. Signed on 12/6/19 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Motion for Stay Deadlines. Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dichter, Anna)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance of Anna L. Dichter appearing on behalf of Kathy Baran, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services Filed by on behalf of Kathy Baran, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Dichter, Anna)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Kathy Baran served on 10/21/2019, answer due on 12/20/2019. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Delivery on Kathy Baran by Certified Mail, #2 Attachment Delivery on U.S. Attorney by Certified Mail) (Renison, Brent) Corrected Service and Answer Dates on 11/6/2019 (joha).
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 10/21/2019, answer due on 12/20/2019. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Delivery on USCIS by Certified Mail, #2 Attachment Delivery on U.S. Attorney by Certified Mail) (Renison, Brent) Corrected Service and Answer Dates on 11/6/2019 (joha).
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Kathy Baran. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/18/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/16/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 3/16/2020. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (rs)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Dwfritz Automation Inc.. (Renison, Brent)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6046537 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by DWFRITZ AUTOMATION INC, GAURAV BATHIJA against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons USCIS, #3 Proposed Summons Kathy A. Baran, Director). (Renison, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dwfritz Automation Inc. et al v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gaurav Bathija
Represented By: Brent W. Renison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwfritz Automation Inc.
Represented By: Brent W. Renison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Anna L. Dichter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Baran
Represented By: Anna L. Dichter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?