Berschauer v. Sherrard
Plaintiff: LINDSAY BERSCHAUER, and Lindsay Berschauer
Defendant: Brian Sherrard
Case Number: 3:2019cv01698
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Brian Sherrard waiver sent on 10/24/2019. Filed by Lindsay Berschauer. (Piucci, Joseph) Modified sent date to reflect date on waiver on 12/3/2019. NEF regenerated (jtj).
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint, #1 . Filed by Lindsay Berschauer. (Piucci, Joseph)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/21/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/23/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 3/23/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (jtj)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6053356. - JURY DEMAND Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by LINDSAY BERSCHAUER, against Brian Sherrard (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Piucci, Joseph) Modified on 10/23/2019 to add payment information. (eo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berschauer v. Sherrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDSAY BERSCHAUER,
Represented By: Joseph E. Piucci
Represented By: Stephen V. Piucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Berschauer
Represented By: Joseph E. Piucci
Represented By: Stephen V. Piucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Sherrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?