Music Sales Corp. et al v. Dionysus, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Music Sales Corp., WB Music Corp., Maraville Music Corp. and Rytvoc, Inc.
Defendant: Manish Patel, Dionysus, L.L.C. and Frank Faillace
Case Number: 3:2019cv01714
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mercer, Cassandra)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #4 upon Manish Patel served on 11/11/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mercer, Cassandra)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #4 upon Dionysus, L.L.C. served on 11/11/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mercer, Cassandra)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Register of Copyrights, U.S. Copyright Office regarding Copyright Report (AO Form 121) #5 . (sb)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (sb)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Dionysus, L.L.C., Frank Faillace, Manish Patel. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/25/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/26/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 3/26/2020. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (sb)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mercer, Cassandra)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6058454 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Music Sales Corp., Rytvoc, Inc., WB Music Corp., Maraville Music Corp. against Dionysus, L.L.C., Frank Faillace, Manish Patel (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Dionysus, L.L.C., #3 Proposed Summons Frank Faillace, #4 Proposed Summons Manish Patel). (Mercer, Cassandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Music Sales Corp. et al v. Dionysus, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manish Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dionysus, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Faillace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Music Sales Corp.
Represented By: Cassandra L. Mercer
Represented By: Vicki L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WB Music Corp.
Represented By: Cassandra L. Mercer
Represented By: Vicki L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maraville Music Corp.
Represented By: Cassandra L. Mercer
Represented By: Vicki L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rytvoc, Inc.
Represented By: Cassandra L. Mercer
Represented By: Vicki L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?