Doe v. St. Helens School District et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Doe
Defendant: Scot Stockwell, St. Helens School District Board, James Carlile, St. Helens School District, Ted Zehr and Heather Anderson-Bitler
Case Number: 3:2019cv01728
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by All Defendants. Filed by Jessica Doe. (Janci, Peter)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Heather Anderson-Bitler, James Carlile, St. Helens School District, Scot Stockwell, Ted Zehr. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons Heather Anderson-Bibler Filed by Jessica Doe. (Janci, Peter)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons James Carlile Filed by Jessica Doe. (Janci, Peter)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons Ted Zehr Filed by Jessica Doe. (Janci, Peter)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Scot Stockwell Filed by Jessica Doe. (Janci, Peter)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons St. Helens School District Filed by Jessica Doe. (Janci, Peter)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/26/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/27/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 3/27/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (jtj)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6060661 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Jessica Doe against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Janci, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. St. Helens School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scot Stockwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Helens School District Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Carlile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Helens School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Zehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Anderson-Bitler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Doe
Represented By: Peter B. Janci
Represented By: William Stewart
Represented By: Stephen F. Crew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?