Hall v. Vision Precision Holdings LLC et al
Plaintiff: William Hall
Defendant: Daniel & Max LLC and Vision Precision Holdings LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01734
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 Transmittal of Certified Copy of Docket Sheet and certified copy of Judgment (#8 ) to Multnomah County Circuit Court. (eo)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT OF REMAND. Signed on 12/5/2019 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb) Modified text (adding signature date and judge) on 12/6/2019 (pvh).
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. On November 12, 2019, the Court issued an Order [#6] to Show Cause in which it directed Defendants to show cause in writing no later than November 27, 2019, why the Court should not remand this matter for lack of jurisdiction. Defendants have not filed a response to the Courts Order and, therefore, have failed to show cause in writing why this matter should not be remanded for lack of jurisdiction. Accordingly, the Court REMANDS this matter to Multnomah County Circuit Court for lack of jurisdiction. (bb)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order to Show Cause. The Court DIRECTS Defendants to Show Cause in Writing no later than 11/27/2019 why this matter should not be remanded for lack of jurisdiction. (See 10 page Order.) Signed on 11/12/2019 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (slm)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by Daniel & Max LLC, Vision Precision Holdings LLC. (Stebbins, Hank)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 2/27/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/30/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 3/30/2020. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sb)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Vision Precision Holdings, LLC. Filed by Daniel & Max LLC, Vision Precision Holdings LLC. (Stebbins, Hank)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Daniel & Max LLC. Filed by Daniel & Max LLC, Vision Precision Holdings LLC. (Stebbins, Hank)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV42087 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6062039 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Daniel & Max LLC, Vision Precision Holdings LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet). (Stebbins, Hank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Vision Precision Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hall
Represented By: Leslie E. Baze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel & Max LLC
Represented By: Hank Stebbins
Represented By: David G. Hosenpud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vision Precision Holdings LLC
Represented By: Hank Stebbins
Represented By: David G. Hosenpud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?