C. et al v. Department of Human Services et al
Plaintiff: James Shikany, J. C. and K. C.
Defendant: Campbell Stewart, Scott Noon, John P. Mosser, Trissa Schiffner, Margaret Steiner, State of Oregon Department of Human Services, Jennifer Ricks, Kathleen McLain and Shirley Vollmuller
Case Number: 3:2019cv01739
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 23 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Kathleen McLain waiver sent on 12/20/2019; John P. Mosser waiver sent on 12/20/2019; Scott Noon waiver sent on 12/20/2019; Jennifer Ricks waiver sent on 12/20/2019; Margaret Steiner waiver sent on 12/20/2019; Shirley Vollmuller waiver sent on 12/20/2019. Filed by James Shikany; J. C.; K. C.. (Galm, Paul)
December 20, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of Change of Address. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lamborn, Joshua)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Acosta - GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #19 . Answer is due by 1/6/2020. (pjg)
December 4, 2019 Filing 20 Declaration of Dirk L. Pierson In Support of Defendant's Motion to Extend Time for Defendants' Response to Complaint. Filed by State of Oregon Department of Human Services. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #19 .) (Pierson, Dirk)
December 4, 2019 Filing 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by State of Oregon Department of Human Services. (Pierson, Dirk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 18 Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6062368. The request has been granted and the amount of $400.00 will be refunded to Carolyn Kendrick Dept Justice Legal Related Doc #5 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (nd)
November 14, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued Electronically as to Kathleen McLain, John P. Mosser, Scott Noon, Jennifer Ricks, Trissa Schiffner, Margaret Steiner, Campbell Stewart, Shirley Vollmuller. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
November 13, 2019 Filing 16 Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Galm, Paul)
November 13, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Galm, Paul)
November 13, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Galm, Paul)
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Galm, Paul)
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Galm, Paul)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Galm, Paul)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Galm, Paul)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Galm, Paul)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta: GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time #6 . Answer is due by 12/5/2019. (pjg)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 Declaration of Heather J. Van Meter In Support of Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by State of Oregon Department of Human Services. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time #6 .) (Van Meter, Heather)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Filed by State of Oregon Department of Human Services. (Van Meter, Heather)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. Filed by State of Oregon Department of Human Services. (Van Meter, Heather)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 A duplicate payment in the amount of $400.00 was submitted by State of Oregon Department of Human Services in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court website. Refund Request is Due 11/12/2019. (ljp)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 2/27/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/30/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 3/30/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (sss)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by State of Oregon Department of Human Services. (Van Meter, Heather)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV38506 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6062745 issued.. Filed by State of Oregon Department of Human Services. (Van Meter, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C. et al v. Department of Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Noon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P. Mosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trissa Schiffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Oregon Department of Human Services
Represented By: Dirk L. Pierson
Represented By: Heather J. Van Meter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Ricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen McLain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Vollmuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Shikany
Represented By: Paul C. Galm
Represented By: Joshua P. Lamborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. C.
Represented By: Paul C. Galm
Represented By: Joshua P. Lamborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. C.
Represented By: Paul C. Galm
Represented By: Joshua P. Lamborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?