Doe et al v. Trump et al
Plaintiff: Latino Network, Brenda Villarruel, Jane Doe #3, Iris Angelina Castro, Blake Doe, Jane Doe #2, John Doe #1, Juan Ramon Morales and Gabino Soriano Castellanos
Defendant: United States of America, Donald Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Secretary of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Department Health & Human Services, Secretary of State and Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
Amicus Curiae: Centro Latino Americano, Oregon Interfaith Movement for Immigrant Justice, State of Oregon, Virginia Garcia Memorial Health Center, Adelante Mujeres, El Programa Hispano Catolico, State of California, VIVA Inclusive Migrant Network, Catholic Charities Immigration Legal Services, Immigrant and Refugee Community Organization and Causa
Case Number: 3:2019cv01743
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Referring Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 5 U.S.C. ยง 706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER SETTING AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE: Defendants will lodge the full Certified Administrative Record by January 10, 2020. Defendants will provide Plaintiffs with a privilege log by January 10, 2020. Plaintiffs may file any motions to compel or to supplement the Certified Administrative Record within 14 days of receiving the Certified Administrative Record. Defendants may serve interrogatories related to class certification issues on the Named Plaintiffs identified in the First Amended Complaint (ECF 100) not later than January 10, 2020. Defendants' shall respond to the First Amended Complaint (ECF 100) not later than January 30, 2020. Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants' interrogatories related to class certification issues not later than February 10, 2020. Defendants may file any supplemental memorandum (or sur-reply) in opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify the Class (ECF 44) not later than February 24, 2020. Plaintiffs may file any supplemental memorandum (or sur-sur-reply) in support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify the Class (ECF 44) not later than March 9, 2020. The Court will take Plaintiff's Motion to Certify the Class (ECF 44) under advisement as of March 9, 2020. The current Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order (ECF 5) is vacated. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (See order for full text.) (dls)
December 25, 2019 Filing 116 Proposed Joint Case Management Schedule . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Order from USCA for the 9th Circuit, USCA # 19-36020 re Notice of Appeal - Preliminary Injunction #104 . The government requests an emergency temporary stay of the district court's order preliminarily enjoining Presidential Proclamation No. 9945, Suspension of Entry of Immigrants Who Will Financially Burden the United States Health Care System, pending consideration of the motion for a stay pending appeal. The government also seeks a stay of the preliminary injunction pending appeal. The plaintiffs oppose both motions. A temporary stay in this context (sometimes referred to as an administrative stay) is only intended to preserve the status quo until the substantive motion for a stay pending appeal can be considered on the merits, and does not constitute in any way a decision as to the merits of the motion for stay pending appeal. Here, the status quo would be disrupted by granting the temporary stay request. Therefore, we deny the request for a temporary stay. The Proclamation has not yet gone into effect. The changes it would make to American immigration policy are major and unprecedented; the harms the government alleges it will suffer pending review of the motion for stay pending appeal are long-term rather than immediate. Our ruling is based solely on the absence of a sufficient exigency to justify changing the status quo, particularly during the few weeks before scheduled oral argument on the merits of the emergency motion; we do not consider the merits of the dispute in any respect. By this order we are expediting briefing and oral argument on the emergency motion and anticipate an expeditious issuance of a decision following argument. Any government reply to plaintiffs' opposition to the motion for stay pending appeal is due December 23, 2019. The parties are directed to appear for oral argument on the motion for stay pending appeal on Thursday, January 9, 2020, at 10:00 am in San Francisco, California. Each side will be allotted 20 minutes of argument time. The parties are encouraged to appear in person if possible. If any party wishes to appear by video, that party must notify Kwame Copeland, 415.355.7888, no later than Friday, January 3, 2020, and must coordinate with Mr. Copeland in making suitable arrangements for an appearance by video. The opening brief and excerpts of record are due January 2, 2020; the answering brief is due January 30, 2020 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. This case will be assigned to the next available oral argument panel for a decision on the merits of the appeal. (jtj)
December 12, 2019 Filing 114 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #6 upon United States of America served on 11/1/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
December 12, 2019 Filing 113 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #6 upon U.S. Department of State served on 11/12/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
December 12, 2019 Filing 112 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #6 upon U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 11/12/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
December 12, 2019 Filing 111 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #6 upon U.S. Department Health & Human Services served on 11/12/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
December 12, 2019 Filing 110 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #6 upon Secretary of State served on 11/12/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
December 12, 2019 Filing 109 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #6 upon Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security served on 11/12/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
December 12, 2019 Filing 108 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #6 upon Donald Trump served on 11/15/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
December 12, 2019 Filing 107 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #6 upon Secretary of Health and Human Services served on 11/12/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
December 12, 2019 Filing 106 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Motion Hearing held on November 22, 2019 before Judge Michael H. Simon, Court Reporter Dennis W. Apodaca, telephone number (503) 326-8182 or dennis_apodaca@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 12/19/2019. Redaction Request due 1/2/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2020. (Apodaca, Dennis)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Order from USCA for the 9th Circuit, USCA # 19-36020 re Notice of Appeal - Preliminary Injunction #104 . The appeal filed December 4, 2019 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than January 2, 2020; the answering brief is due January 30, 2020 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. (jtj)
December 5, 2019 USCA Case Number and Notice confirming Docketing Record on Appeal re Notice of Appeal - Preliminary Injunction #104 . Case Appealed to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Case Number 19-36020 assigned. (jtj)
December 4, 2019 Filing 104 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)). Filed by All Defendants. (Ward, Brian)
November 27, 2019 Filing 103 Declaration of Nadia Dahab . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion #102 .) (Dahab, Nadia)
November 27, 2019 Filing 102 Reply to Motion to Certify the Class #44 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
November 27, 2019 Filing 101 Notice of Filing First Amended Class Action Complaint Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
November 27, 2019 Filing 100 First Amended Complaint . Filed by Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #2, John Doe #1, Blake Doe, Brenda Villarruel, Juan Ramon Morales, Latino Network, Iris Angelina Castro, Gabino Soriano Castellanos against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2). (Dahab, Nadia)
November 27, 2019 Filing 99 Notice of Appearance of Tess Hellgren appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs Filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Hellgren, Tess)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed on 11/27/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 SCHEDULING ORDER - Within a reasonable time not to exceed 28 days without further Court order, the parties shall confer and then file with the Court a proposed case management order addressing: (1) a process and schedule for completing class discovery and supplementing, if needed, any briefing on class certification; (2) a process and schedule for resolving any remaining disputes concerning the lodging of the Administrative Record; and (3) any other matters that either party wishes to raise. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
November 26, 2019 Filing 96 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Opinion and Order - Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (ECF #46 ) is GRANTED. Until the Court resolves this case on the merits or orders otherwise, or until such time as the parties agree in writing to amend, supersede, or terminate this Preliminary Injunction, IT IS ORDERED that Defendants are enjoined from taking any action to implement or enforce Presidential Proclamation No. 9945, "Presidential Proclamation on the Suspension of Entry of Immigrants Who Will Financially Burden the United States Healthcare System." Signed on 11/26/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
November 22, 2019 Filing 94 Response in Opposition to Motion to Certify the Class #44 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Moran, Courtney)
November 22, 2019 Filing 93 MINUTES OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING: ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF #46 ) is taken under advisement on November 22, 2019. Nadia H. Dehab, Stephen W. Manning, Esther H. Sung, Karen C. Tumlin, Scott D. Stein, Jesse Bless, and Kevin Fee present as counsel for Plaintiffs. August E. Flentje, Brian C. Ward, and Courtney E. Moran present as counsel for Defendants. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. (mja)
November 21, 2019 Filing 92 Supplemental Brief . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #46 .) (Dahab, Nadia)
November 21, 2019 Filing 91 Administrative Record . Filed by All Defendants. (Ward, Brian)
November 19, 2019 Filing 90 Reply to Motion for Preliminary Injunction #46 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Manning, Stephen)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER - Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (ECF #87 ) is DENIED with leave to renew if the parties can reach an agreement regarding a modest extension of the pending TRO. If such an extension is agreed upon, the parties should confer regarding an appropriate briefing schedule that allows both sides to have sufficient time to brief their respective positions on the pending motions for preliminary injunction and class certification and that also allows the Court sufficient time to consider the parties' arguments before the expiration of the TRO. Signed on 11/19/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
November 19, 2019 Filing 88 Brief of Amici Curiae States and City in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Filed by State of California, State of Oregon. (Chang, Deanna)
November 18, 2019 Filing 87 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Certify the Class #44 . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Ward, Brian)
November 18, 2019 Filing 86 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Kevin M. Fee (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: kmfee. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin M. Fee for Iris Angelina Castro, Blake Doe,Jane Doe #2 Jane Doe #3 John Doe #1, Latino Network, Juan Ramon Morales,Brenda Villarruel. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6084302 issued. Signed on 11/18/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
November 15, 2019 Filing 84 Response in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction #46 . Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Ward, Brian)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Opinion and Order - Defendants shall produce, before noon November 20, 2019, documents from the State Department's administrative record relating to the amendments to the Foreign Affairs Manual and the State Department's "methodology" and other definitions implementing the Proclamation. If Plaintiffs believe that additional documents from the administrative record are necessary at this stage of the litigation, Plaintiffs may contact the Courtroom Deputy with their request. If Defendants cannot feasibly produce all of the documents as ordered, Defendants may contact the Court and provide an explanation. Plaintiffs may file a supplemental brief of no more than 10 pages addressing new arguments raised by the produced documents, if any, on or before 3:00 p.m. on November 21, 2019. The parties shall confer on a date for the lodging of the full administrative record. Signed on 11/15/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
November 15, 2019 Filing 82 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kevin Fee . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6084302. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Manning, Stephen)
November 15, 2019 Filing 81 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding Notice of Appearance #80 . A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The incorrect PDF was attached. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment. (joha)
November 15, 2019 Filing 80 Notice of Appearance of August E. Flentje appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Flentje, August) (Main Document 80 replaced on 11/15/2019) (joha).
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER - The Government's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Oversized Brief (ECF #77 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
November 14, 2019 Filing 78 Reply to Motion to Compel Administrative Record #68 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
November 14, 2019 Filing 77 Unopposed Motion to File Excess Pages . Filed by All Defendants. (Ward, Brian)
November 13, 2019 Filing 76 Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel Administrative Record #68 . Filed by All Defendants. (Moran, Courtney)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER - The Amici organizations Causa, El Programa Hispano Catlico, Virginia Garcia Memorial Health Center, Adelante Mujeres, Oregon Interfaith Movement for Immigrant Justice, Centro Latino Americano, Catholic Charities Immigration Legal Services, Immigrant and Refugee Community Organization, and VIVA Inclusive Migrant Network's Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae (ECF #72 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER - The State of Oregon and the State of California's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae States and City in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (ECF #71 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
November 12, 2019 Filing 73 Proposed Amicus Curiae Appearance entered by Leland Baxter-Neal on behalf of Adelante Mujeres, Catholic Charities Immigration Legal Services, Causa, Centro Latino Americano, El Programa Hispano Catolico, Immigrant and Refugee Community Organization, Oregon Interfaith Movement for Immigrant Justice, VIVA Inclusive Migrant Network, Virginia Garcia Memorial Health Center . Filed by on behalf of Adelante Mujeres, Catholic Charities Immigration Legal Services, Causa, Centro Latino Americano, El Programa Hispano Catolico, Immigrant and Refugee Community Organization, Oregon Interfaith Movement for Immigrant Justice, VIVA Inclusive Migrant Network, Virginia Garcia Memorial Health Center. (Baxter-Neal, Leland)
November 12, 2019 Filing 72 Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae . Filed by Causa, El Programa Hispano Catolico, Virginia Garcia Memorial Health Center, Adelante Mujeres, Oregon Interfaith Movement for Immigrant Justice, Centro Latino Americano, Catholic Charities Immigration Legal Services, Immigrant and Refugee Community Organization, VIVA Inclusive Migrant Network. (Baxter-Neal, Leland)
November 12, 2019 Filing 71 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae States and City in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support. Filed by State of Oregon, State of California. (Chang, Deanna)
November 12, 2019 Filing 70 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman to Judge Michael H. Simon. (eo)
November 11, 2019 Filing 69 Declaration of Nadia H. Dahab . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to compel #68 .) (Dahab, Nadia)
November 11, 2019 Filing 68 Motion to Compel Administrative Record. Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
November 8, 2019 Filing 67 Declaration of Nadia Dahab . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #46 .) (Manning, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 66 Declaration of Blake Doe . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #46 , Motion to certify class #44 .) (Manning, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 65 Declaration of Pam Macewan . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #46 , Motion to certify class #44 .) (Manning, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 64 Declaration of Stacey Pogue . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #46 , Motion to certify class #44 .) (Manning, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 63 Declaration of Joan Watson-Patko . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #46 , Motion to certify class #44 .) (Manning, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 62 Declaration of Dagmar Butte . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #46 , Motion to certify class #44 .) (Manning, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 61 Declaration of Louise Norris . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #46 , Motion to certify class #44 .) (Manning, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 60 Declaration of Brenda Villarruel . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #46 , Motion to certify class #44 .) (Manning, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 59 Declaration of Carmen Rubio . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #46 , Motion to certify class #44 .) (Manning, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 58 Declaration of Gabino Castellanos . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #46 , Motion to certify class #44 .) (Manning, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 57 Declaration of Dania Palanker . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #46 , Motion to certify class #44 .) (Manning, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 56 Declaration of Sarah Lueck . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #46 , Motion to certify class #44 .) (Manning, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 55 Declaration of John Doe 1 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #46 , Motion to certify class #44 .) (Manning, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 54 Declaration of Leighton Ku . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #46 , Motion to certify class #44 .) (Manning, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 53 Declaration of Juan Ramon Morales . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #46 , Motion to certify class #44 .) (Manning, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 52 Declaration of Dulce Ramos . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #46 , Motion to certify class #44 .) (Manning, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 51 Declaration of Iris Castro . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #46 , Motion to certify class #44 .) (Manning, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 50 Declaration of Daniel Rhoads . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #46 , Motion to certify class #44 .) (Manning, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 49 Declaration of Jane Doe 2 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #46 , Motion to certify class #44 .) (Manning, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 48 Declaration of Charles H Kuck . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #46 , Motion to certify class #44 .) (Manning, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 47 Declaration of Jane Doe 3 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #46 , Motion to certify class #44 .) (Manning, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 46 Motion for Preliminary Injunction . Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Manning, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 45 Declaration of Stephen W Manning . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to certify class #44 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Presidential Proclamation Ntc of Oct 4 2019 WH, #2 Exhibit Presidential Proclamation Ntc of Oct 4 2019 DOS, #3 Exhibit AIDS United, #4 Exhibit American Medical Assn, #5 Exhibit Asian Pacific Islander American Health Forum, #6 Exhibit Center for Elder Law & Justice, #7 Exhibit Childrens Health Watch, #8 Exhibit Consortium for Citizens with Disabilities, #9 Exhibit Covered California, #10 Exhibit DC Health Benefit Exchange, #11 Exhibit Disability Rights California, #12 Exhibit Latino Network, #13 Exhibit Legal Aid Society, #14 Exhibit Mass Health Connector, #15 Exhibit MN Sure, #16 Exhibit Natl Assn Pediatric Nurse Practicioners, #17 Exhibit Natl Disability Rights Network, #18 Exhibit Natl Health Law Project, #19 Exhibit Natl Immigration Law Center, #20 Exhibit Or Dept Consumer Business Services, #21 Exhibit Oregon Primary Care Assn, #22 Exhibit American Occ Therapy Assn, #23 Exhibit Virginia Garcia Memorial Health Center, #24 Exhibit AILA Comment, #25 Exhibit Report to Congress on Medicaid, #26 Exhibit DOS Emergency Notice, #27 Exhibit OMB Notice of Action, #28 Exhibit Response to Emergency PRA) (Manning, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 44 Motion to Certify the Class . Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Manning, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Oversized Brief (ECF No. #42 ). Ordered on 11/8/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (gw)
November 7, 2019 Filing 42 Unopposed Motion to File Excess Pages . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
November 7, 2019 Filing 41 Notice of Appearance of Brian C. Ward appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Ward, Brian)
November 6, 2019 Filing 40 Notice of Appearance of Courtney E. Moran appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Moran, Courtney)
November 6, 2019 Filing 39 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #28 Declaration, #26 Declaration, #27 Declaration, #24 Declaration, #20 Declaration, #18 Declaration, #29 Declaration, #23 Declaration, #16 Declaration, #17 Declaration, #30 Declaration, #25 Declaration. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The documents were missing a case caption cover page. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachments. (cw)
November 4, 2019 Filing 38 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Naomi A. Igra (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: naigra. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Naomi A. Igra for Iris Angelina Castro, Blake Doe, Jane Doe #2 Jane Doe #3,r John Doe #1,Latino Network, Juan Ramon Morales,and Brenda Villarruel. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6066703 issued. Signed on 11/4/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
November 4, 2019 Filing 36 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Jess Bless (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: jbless. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jesse Bless for Iris Angelina Castro, Blake Doe,Jane Doe #2,J Jane Doe #3, John Doe #1, Latino Network, Juan Ramon Morales,and Brenda Villarruel. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6066625 issued. Signed on 11/4/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
November 3, 2019 Filing 34 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Motion for Temporary Restraining Order held on November 2, 2019 before Judge Michael H. Simon, Court Reporter Dennis W. Apodaca, telephone number (503) 326-8182 or dennis_apodaca@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 11/12/2019. Redaction Request due 11/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/3/2020. (Apodaca, Dennis)
November 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - Defendants are hereby temporarily restrained and enjoined from taking any action to implement or enforce Presidential Proclamation No. 9945 ("Presidential Proclamation on the Suspension of Entry of Immigrants Who Will Financially Burden the United States Healthcare System"). 2. In the interest of justice, Plaintiffs need not provide any security and all requirements under Rule 65(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure are waived. 3. The Court will hold a hearing on Friday, November 22, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 15B of the Mark O. Hatfield United States Courthouse in Portland, Oregon to determine whether a preliminary injunction should be issued. The Court will set a briefing schedule by separate order. 4. This Order shall expire twenty-eight (28) days after entry, unless otherwise extended by stipulation of the parties or by further order of the Court. Signed on 11/2/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
November 2, 2019 Filing 32 MINUTES OF ORAL ARGUMENT HEARING: ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF #7 ) is GRANTED for a period not to exceed 28 days. Formal order to follow. ORDER - Setting a briefing schedule as follows: Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due by November 8, 2019; Defendants' response is due by November 15, 2019; Plaintiffs' reply is due by November 19, 2019; and a Preliminary Injunction Hearing is set for Friday, November 22, 2019 at 1:00PM in Portland, Courtroom 15B, before Judge Michael H. Simon. Nadia H. Dehab, Stephen W. Manning, Esther H. Sung, Karen C. Tumlin, Scott D. Stein, Stephanie Hales, Keven Fee, and Jesse Bless present as counsel for Plaintiffs. Andrew Bernie, Brian Ward, and Courtney Moran present as counsel for Defendants. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. (mja)
November 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym (ECF #15 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
November 2, 2019 Filing 30 Declaration of Jane Doe #3 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #7 .) (Dahab, Nadia) (Main Document 30 replaced on 11/6/2019) (cw).
November 2, 2019 Filing 29 Declaration of Jane Doe #2 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #7 .) (Dahab, Nadia) (Main Document 29 replaced on 11/6/2019) (cw).
November 2, 2019 Filing 28 Declaration of John Doe #1 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #7 .) (Dahab, Nadia) (Main Document 28 replaced on 11/6/2019) (cw).
November 2, 2019 Filing 27 Declaration of Blake Doe . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #7 .) (Dahab, Nadia) (Main Document 27 replaced on 11/6/2019) (cw).
November 2, 2019 Filing 26 Declaration of Juan Ramon Morales . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #7 .) (Dahab, Nadia) (Main Document 26 replaced on 11/6/2019) (cw).
November 2, 2019 Filing 25 Declaration of Brenda Villarruel . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #7 .) (Dahab, Nadia) (Main Document 25 replaced on 11/6/2019) (cw).
November 2, 2019 Filing 24 Declaration of Iris Angelina Castro . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #7 .) (Dahab, Nadia) (Main Document 24 replaced on 11/6/2019) (cw).
November 2, 2019 Filing 23 Declaration of Carmen Rubio . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #7 .) (Dahab, Nadia) (Main Document 23 replaced on 11/6/2019) (cw).
November 1, 2019 Filing 22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Naomi A Igra . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6066703. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Manning, Stephen)
November 1, 2019 Filing 21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jesse Bless . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6066625. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Manning, Stephen)
November 1, 2019 Filing 20 Declaration of Jane Doe #3 . Filed by Blake Doe, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, John Doe #1. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #15 .) (Dahab, Nadia) (Main Document 20 replaced on 11/6/2019) (cw).
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael H. Simon. ORDER - Resetting the Telephone Conference to an In-Court Conference regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF #7 ) set for 11/2/2019 at 2:00PM in Portland, Courtroom 15B, before Judge Michael H. Simon. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
November 1, 2019 Filing 18 Declaration of Jane Doe #2 . Filed by Blake Doe, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, John Doe #1. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #15 .) (Dahab, Nadia) (Main Document 18 replaced on 11/6/2019) (cw).
November 1, 2019 Filing 17 Declaration of John Doe . Filed by Blake Doe, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, John Doe #1. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #15 .) (Dahab, Nadia) (Main Document 17 replaced on 11/6/2019) (cw).
November 1, 2019 Filing 16 Declaration of Blake Doe . Filed by Blake Doe, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, John Doe #1. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #15 .) (Dahab, Nadia) (Main Document 16 replaced on 11/6/2019) (cw).
November 1, 2019 Filing 15 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym. Filed by Blake Doe, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, John Doe #1. (Dahab, Nadia)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael H. Simon. ORDER - Setting a Telephone Conference regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF #7 ) for 11/2/2019 at 02:00PM. The Court will provide the parties' with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Scott D. Stein (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: sdstein. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (eo)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scott D. Stein for Iris Angelina Castro, Blake Doe, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, John Doe #1, Latino Network, Juan Ramon Morales, and Brenda Villarruel. Signed on November 1, 2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (eo)
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Esther H. Sung (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: ehsung. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (eo)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Esther H. Sung for Iris Angelina Castro, Blake Doe, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, John Doe #1, Latino Network, Juan Ramon Morales, and Brenda Villarruel. Signed on November 1, 2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (eo)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Karen C. Tumlin (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: kctumlin. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (eo)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Karen C. Tumlin for Iris Angelina Castro, Blake Doe, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, John Doe #1, Latino Network, Juan Ramon Morales, and Brenda Villarruel. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Signed on November 1, 2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (eo)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order . Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Secretary of Health and Human Services, Secretary of State, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, Donald Trump, U.S. Department Health & Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/28/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/30/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 3/30/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (joha)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott D Stein . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6063408. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Manning, Stephen)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Esther H Sung . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6063406. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Manning, Stephen)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karen C Tumlin . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6063401. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Manning, Stephen)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6062599 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by John Doe 2, John Doe, Juan Ramon Morales, Blake Doe, Latino Network, Brenda Villarruel, iris angelina castro against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Michael Pompeo, #3 Proposed Summons Kevin McAleenan, #4 Proposed Summons Donald Trump, #5 Proposed Summons US State Department, #6 Proposed Summons US Homeland Security, #7 Proposed Summons US Health & Human Services, #8 Proposed Summons Alex Azar, #9 Proposed Summons United States of America). (Manning, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: August E. Flentje
Represented By: Brian C. Ward
Represented By: Courtney E. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Represented By: August E. Flentje
Represented By: Brian C. Ward
Represented By: Courtney E. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: August E. Flentje
Represented By: Brian C. Ward
Represented By: Courtney E. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Health and Human Services
Represented By: August E. Flentje
Represented By: Brian C. Ward
Represented By: Courtney E. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Represented By: August E. Flentje
Represented By: Brian C. Ward
Represented By: Courtney E. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department Health & Human Services
Represented By: August E. Flentje
Represented By: Brian C. Ward
Represented By: Courtney E. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State
Represented By: August E. Flentje
Represented By: Brian C. Ward
Represented By: Courtney E. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: August E. Flentje
Represented By: Brian C. Ward
Represented By: Courtney E. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latino Network
Represented By: Stephen W. Manning
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Jesse Bless
Represented By: Scott D. Stein
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Represented By: Naomi A. Igra
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Kevin M. Fee
Represented By: Esther H. Sung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Villarruel
Represented By: Stephen W. Manning
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Jesse Bless
Represented By: Scott D. Stein
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Represented By: Naomi A. Igra
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Kevin M. Fee
Represented By: Esther H. Sung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe #3
Represented By: Stephen W. Manning
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Jesse Bless
Represented By: Scott D. Stein
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Represented By: Naomi A. Igra
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Kevin M. Fee
Represented By: Esther H. Sung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris Angelina Castro
Represented By: Stephen W. Manning
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Jesse Bless
Represented By: Scott D. Stein
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Represented By: Naomi A. Igra
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Kevin M. Fee
Represented By: Esther H. Sung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Doe
Represented By: Stephen W. Manning
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Jesse Bless
Represented By: Scott D. Stein
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Represented By: Naomi A. Igra
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Kevin M. Fee
Represented By: Esther H. Sung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe #2
Represented By: Stephen W. Manning
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Jesse Bless
Represented By: Scott D. Stein
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Represented By: Naomi A. Igra
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Kevin M. Fee
Represented By: Esther H. Sung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe #1
Represented By: Stephen W. Manning
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Jesse Bless
Represented By: Scott D. Stein
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Represented By: Naomi A. Igra
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Kevin M. Fee
Represented By: Esther H. Sung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Ramon Morales
Represented By: Stephen W. Manning
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Jesse Bless
Represented By: Scott D. Stein
Represented By: Tess Hellgren
Represented By: Naomi A. Igra
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Kevin M. Fee
Represented By: Esther H. Sung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabino Soriano Castellanos
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Centro Latino Americano
Represented By: Leland Baxter-Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Oregon Interfaith Movement for Immigrant Justice
Represented By: Leland Baxter-Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Oregon
Represented By: Deanna J. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Virginia Garcia Memorial Health Center
Represented By: Leland Baxter-Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Adelante Mujeres
Represented By: Leland Baxter-Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: El Programa Hispano Catolico
Represented By: Leland Baxter-Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of California
Represented By: Deanna J. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: VIVA Inclusive Migrant Network
Represented By: Leland Baxter-Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Catholic Charities Immigration Legal Services
Represented By: Leland Baxter-Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Immigrant and Refugee Community Organization
Represented By: Leland Baxter-Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Causa
Represented By: Leland Baxter-Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?