Kuiken v. United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Russell Kuiken
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01762
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Confirmation of Transmittal of Case #6 to Washington County Circuit Court of Oregon via OJD website. (joha)
November 22, 2019 Confirmation of Transmittal of Case #6 to Washington County Circuit Court via OJD website. (ecp)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 Transmittal of Certified Copy of Docket Sheet and certified copy of Order on motion to remand #5 to Circuit Court of Oregon for the County of Washington. (ecp)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Based on the foregoing Stipulation of the parties to remand this case to the Circuit Court of Oregon for the County of Washington, case number 19CV42258, IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 11/12/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 Stipulated Motion to Remand to State Court. Filed by United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Turner, Sarah)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 3/3/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/2/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 4/2/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (joha)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Declaration of Sarah N. Turner in Support of Notice of Removal. Filed by United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Washington County Circuit Court Records and Process, #2 Exhibit 2: 2017 Summary Plan Description for Reformed Benefits Association, #3 Exhibit 3: 2019 Summary Plan Description for Reformed Benefits Association) (Turner, Sarah)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV42258 from Washington County Circuit Court of Oregon. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6066742 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Complaint, Case #19CV42258, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Turner, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuiken v. United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Kuiken
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah N. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?