Boitano v. Privateer LLC
Plaintiff: John Samuel "Sam" Boitano and Samuel John Stebbins
Defendant: Privateer LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01775
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Marine Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Telephonic Rule 16 Conference is set for 2/11/2020 at 02:30 PM before Judge Anna J. Brown. Before the Conference, at a minimum counsel must conduct real-time conferral by telephone to prepare a proposed case-management schedule to be submitted to the Court prior to the Rule 16 Conference. The parties shall submit a written joint status report (to include proposed case management schedule) no later than 2/3/2020 that include deadlines to complete discovery, to file dispositive motions, and for trial. Parties shall also determine whether they agree to forgo the disclosures required under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1), and file separately with the Clerk of Court the form required by LR 26-2 no later than 2/3/2020. (bb)
December 26, 2019 Filing 12 Answer to #1 Complaint, Privateer LLC's Answer and Affirmative Defenses. Filed by Privateer LLC. (Folawn, Colin)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court grants Defendant Privateers STIPULATED JOINT MOTION [#9] FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. Privateers response to Plaintiffs Complaint is due no later than 12/26/19. (bb)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Privateer LLC. (Folawn, Colin)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and Affirmative Defenses, Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Privateer LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Folawn, Colin)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Jeffrey M. Campiche (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: jmcampiche. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey M. Campiche for John Samuel \"Sam\" Boitano. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6081161 issued. Signed on 11/18/2019 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffery M. Campiche Attorney for Plaintiff Boitano. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6081161. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Arnold, Philip)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance of David R. Boyajian appearing on behalf of Privateer LLC Filed by on behalf of Privateer LLC. (Boyajian, David)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance of Colin J. Folawn appearing on behalf of Privateer LLC Filed by on behalf of Privateer LLC. (Folawn, Colin)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Privateer LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/9/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/6/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 4/6/2020. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (rs)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 First Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6069870 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by John Samuel "Sam" Boitano against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Arnold, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boitano v. Privateer LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Samuel "Sam" Boitano
Represented By: Philip G. Arnold
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Campiche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel John Stebbins
Represented By: Philip G. Arnold
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Campiche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Privateer LLC
Represented By: David R. Boyajian
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Campiche
Represented By: Colin J. Folawn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?