Leiss v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Curtis B. Leiss
Defendant: Commissioner of Internal Revenue and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv01783
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6532
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 12 Plaintiff's Proposed Order. Filed by Curtis B. Leiss. (joha) Modified text on 1/2/2020 (pvh).
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: referring Findings & Recommendation #10 and Complaint #2 , to Judge Karin J. Immergut for her review and determination. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 12/16/2019.) (pvh)
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 Findings & Recommendation: Because the Complaint fails to allege a plausible claim for relief, the case should be dismissed without prejudice. These Findings and Recommendation will be referred to a district judge. Objections, if any, are due January 2, 2020. If no objections are filed, then the Findings and Recommendations will go under advisement on that date. If objections are filed, then a response is due within 14 days after being served with a copy of the objections. When the response is due or filed, whichever date is earlier, the Findings and Recommendation will go under advisement. Signed on 12/16/2019 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 12/16/2019.) (pvh)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Suspend Minute Order #6 is denied as it does nothing to explain or cure the deficiencies articulated in the Court's November 12, 2019 Order to Show Cause. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 12/06/2019.) (pvh)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (joha)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 Affidavit of Curtis B. Leiss in Support of Motion to Suspend Minute Order #6 . Filed by Curtis B. Leiss. (joha)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to Suspend Minute Order. Filed by Curtis B. Leiss. (joha)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice to Self-Represented Litigants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 12/4/2019.) (pvh)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause in writing by December 12, 2019, why the complaint should not be dismissed, alternatively, by that date plaintiff may file an amended complaint curing the defects identified in this order. Signed on 11/12/2019 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/12/2019.) (pvh) Modified on 11/27/2019 (cw).
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/6/2019.) (joha)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Curtis B. Leiss against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (joha)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Curtis B. Leiss. (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leiss v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis B. Leiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?