Donaldson v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Bradley B. Donaldson
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv01856
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405g
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance of Thomas M. Elsberry appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration Filed by on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Elsberry, Thomas)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 11/29/2019, answer due on 3/30/2020. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney, Regional Counsel or Agency, and the U.S. Attorney General. (Evans, H.)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . Signed on 11/19/19 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (rs)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Bradley B. Donaldson. (Evans, H.)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner (In forma pauperis status selected). Filed by Bradley B. Donaldson against Commissioner Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Evans, H.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donaldson v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Renata Gowie
Represented By: Thomas M. Elsberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley B. Donaldson
Represented By: H. Peter Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?