Seamons v. Keystone RV Company et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Seamons
Defendant: CWI, Inc., Keystone RV Company, Bodily RV, Inc. and Olinger RV Centers, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01888
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Property Damage - Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 19 Declaration of Ryan M. Lee In Support of Plaintiff's Response to Bodily RV's Motions to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer Venue. Filed by Kevin Seamons. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion, #17 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Lee, Ryan)
January 7, 2020 Filing 18 Declaration of Kevin Seamons in Support of His Response to Defendant Bodily RV, Inc.'s Motions to Dismiss and ALternative Motion to Transfer Venue. Filed by Kevin Seamons. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion, #17 .) (Lee, Ryan)
January 7, 2020 Filing 17 Response in Opposition Defendant Bodily RV, Inc.'s to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , for Improper Venue, and Alternative Motion to Transfer Venue #11 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Kevin Seamons. (Lee, Ryan)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion #15 for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Bodily RV, Inc.'s Motions to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer Venue #11 . Plaintiff's Response due date is extended from 12/31/2019 to 1/7/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (pvh)
December 27, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply Defendant Bodily RV, Inc.'s to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , for Improper Venue, and Alternative Motion to Transfer Venue #11 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lee, Ryan)
December 17, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Bodily RV, Inc.. (Gardner, Jason)
December 17, 2019 Filing 13 Declaration of Jason A. Gardner . Filed by Bodily RV, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction #11 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Gardner, Jason)
December 17, 2019 Filing 12 Declaration of Mike Ball . Filed by Bodily RV, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction #11 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Gardner, Jason)
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , for Improper Venue, and Alternative Motion to Transfer Venue. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Bodily RV, Inc.. (Gardner, Jason)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Olinger RV Centers, LLC. (Gardner, Jason)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by CWI, Inc.. (Gardner, Jason)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 Answer to #6 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand . Filed by Keystone RV Company. (Gardner, Jason)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 Answer to #6 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand . Filed by Olinger RV Centers, LLC, CWI, Inc.. (Gardner, Jason)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 First Amended Complaint . Filed by Kevin Seamons against All Defendants. (Lee, Ryan)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #4 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 12/5/2019. Ordered on 11/27/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint - part of Ex. A to Notice of Removal, #1 . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Smith, Vicki)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 3/24/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/23/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 4/23/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (jtj)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Keystone RV Company. (Smith, Vicki)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV45295 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6093458 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Keystone RV Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Smith, Vicki)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seamons v. Keystone RV Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CWI, Inc.
Represented By: Helaina L. Chinn
Represented By: Jason A. Gardner
Represented By: Vicki M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keystone RV Company
Represented By: Vicki M. Smith
Represented By: Helaina L. Chinn
Represented By: Jason A. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bodily RV, Inc.
Represented By: Helaina L. Chinn
Represented By: Jason A. Gardner
Represented By: Vicki M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olinger RV Centers, LLC
Represented By: Helaina L. Chinn
Represented By: Jason A. Gardner
Represented By: Vicki M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Seamons
Represented By: Ryan M. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?