Tizzard v. United States of America Department of Veterans Affairs
Plaintiff: Ronald Tizzard
Defendant: United States of America and United States of America Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 3:2019cv01902
Filed: November 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Referring Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Judge Michael H. Simon. (eo)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to United States of America Department of Veterans Affairs. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons Filed by Ronald Tizzard. (Downs, Ronald)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons Filed by Ronald Tizzard. (Downs, Ronald)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Filed by Ronald Tizzard. (Downs, Ronald)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/25/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/24/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 4/24/2020. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (joha)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint #1 . Filed by Ronald Tizzard. (Downs, Ronald)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6098592 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Ronald Tizzard against United States of America. (Downs, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tizzard v. United States of America Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Tizzard
Represented By: Ronald W. Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?