Intellicad Technology Consortium v. Suzhou Gstarsoft Co. Ltd.
Plaintiff: The Intellicad Technology Consortium and Intellicad Technology Consortium
Defendant: Suzhou Gstarsoft Co. Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01963
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Filing 14 First Amended Complaint . Filed by Intellicad Technology Consortium against Suzhou Gstarsoft Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A). (Lindsay, Shawn)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #10 . Signed on 1/23/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (ECF 7) is GRANTED. Defendant shall have until February 28, 2020 to answer or other respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Any further requests for extension will be disfavored. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (dls)
December 26, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint Complaint, #1 #7 . Filed by Intellicad Technology Consortium. (Berne, Craig)
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kyle R. Canavera . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6132455. Filed by Suzhou Gstarsoft Co. Ltd.. (Markley, Julia)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Suzhou Gstarsoft Co. Ltd.. (Markley, Julia)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 Declaration of Julia E. Markley in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Filed by Suzhou Gstarsoft Co. Ltd.. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #7 .) (Markley, Julia)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint Complaint, #1 . Filed by Suzhou Gstarsoft Co. Ltd.. (Markley, Julia)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order) (Berne, Craig)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Alternative Service (ECF #4 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for Alternative Service. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Decl of Shawn Lindsay, #2 Attachment Decl of David Lorenzo) (Berne, Craig)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Suzhou Gstarsoft Co. Ltd.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/2/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/4/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 5/4/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (joha)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6106655 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by The Intellicad Technology Consortium against All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Attachment Corporate Disclosure Statement). (Berne, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intellicad Technology Consortium v. Suzhou Gstarsoft Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzhou Gstarsoft Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Julia E. Markley
Represented By: Kyle R. Canavera
Represented By: Sasha A. Petrova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Intellicad Technology Consortium
Represented By: Shawn M. Lindsay
Represented By: Craig R. Berne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellicad Technology Consortium
Represented By: Shawn M. Lindsay
Represented By: Craig R. Berne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?