Truong v. Frito-Lay North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lan Truong
Defendant: Frito-Lay North America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01971
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's unopposed request (by e-mail dated 1/29/2020) for an extension of time. Final Papers must be submitted by 2/21/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman: As this case is reported settled in principle, the current case management deadlines are Stayed and the parties shall have until 1/31/2020 to submit Final Papers. (gm)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #4 upon Frito-Lay North America, Inc. served on 12/10/2019 Filed by Lan Truong. (Ball, James)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint, #1 . Filed by Lan Truong. (Ball, James)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Register of Copyrights regarding Copyright Report, #5 . (ecp)
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (ecp)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Frito-Lay North America, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/3/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/4/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 5/4/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons Filed by Lan Truong. (Ball, James)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6108709 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included copyrights: VA0002169617--Corn.--Lan Truong. Filed by Lan Truong against Frito-Lay North America, Inc.. (Ball, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Truong v. Frito-Lay North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lan Truong
Represented By: James D. Ball
Represented By: Bryan Wasetis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frito-Lay North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?