Franson v. US Dept. of Veterans Affairs et al
Plaintiff: James W Franson, II
Defendant: Daniel Hoonyul Bang and US Dept. of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 3:2019cv01983
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Acosta - Based on Order #11 dated 1/27/2020, plaintiff has 30 days to amend the complaint. Therefore, Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time #9 is terminated as moot. Amended complaint to be filed by 2/27/2020. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 1/29/2020.) (pjg)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - No party having made objections, this Court follows the recommendation of the Advisory Committee and reviews Magistrate Judge Acosta's Findings and Recommendation for clear error on the face of the record. No such error is apparent. Accordingly, the Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Acosta's Findings and Recommendation, ECF #6 . Plaintiffs Complaint (ECF #2 ) is dismissed with leave to amend within 30 days. Signed on 1/27/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 1/27/2020.) (mja)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Acosta - DEFERRING Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time #9 until a final ruling is made regarding Finding & Recommendation #6 . (Mailed to Pro Se party on 1/22/2020.) (pjg)
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. Filed by James W Franson, II. (jn) .
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to James W. Franson II, 1631 NE Broadway St., #434, Portland, OR 97232 regarding Order referring Findings & Recommendation 7 , and Findings & Recommendation #6 . (pjg)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order by Judge Acosta - REFERRING Findings & Recommendation #6 regarding complaint #2 to the Honorable Michael H. Simon for review and final determination. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 1/7/2020.) (pjg)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 Findings & Recommendation: Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. #2 ) should be DISMISSED. Any pending motions should be DISMISSED as MOOT. The court recommends that the district judge dismiss Plaintiff's complaint with leave to amend within 30 days of the district judge's order of dismissal to file an amended complaint curing the deficiencies noted above. The court further recommends that the district judge advise Plaintiff that failure to file an amended complaint which cures the deficiencies noted shall result in the dismissal of this proceeding, with prejudice. SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will refer its Findings and Recommendation to a district judge. Objections, if any, are due fourteen (14) days from service of the Findings and Recommendation. If no objections are filed, the Findings and Recommendation will go under advisement on that date. If objections are filed, a response is due fourteen (14) days after being served with a copy of the objections. When the response is due or filed, whichever date is earlier, the Findings and Recommendation will go under advisement. IT IS SO ORDERED. DATED this 7th day of January, 2020 by United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 1/7/2020.) (pjg)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to James W. Franson II regarding Order on motion/application for leave to proceed ifp #4 . (pjg)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Acosta - GRANTING Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #1 signed on 1/3/2020 (Mailed to Pro Se party on 1/3/2020.) (pjg)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 12/9/2019.) (joha)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by James W Franson, II against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (joha)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by James W Franson, II. (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franson v. US Dept. of Veterans Affairs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Hoonyul Bang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Dept. of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W Franson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?