Rote v. Committee on Judicial Conduct and Disability of the Judicial Conference of the United States et al
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY C. ROTE
Defendant: ELIZABETH WEISHAUPL, Oregon State Bar, SUSIE NORBY, WILLIAM B. CROW, Carol Bernick, ROBERT KUGLER, Oregon Judicial Department, Robert Herndon, COMMITTEE ON JUDICIAL CONDUCT AND DISABILITY OF THE JUDICIAL CONFERENCE OF THE UNITED STATES, JAMES EGAN, COLORADO JUDICIAL DEPARTMENT, JOHN, 1-5 DOES, OREGON STATE BAR AND PROFESSIONAL LIABILITY FUND, United States Department of Justice, Hon. Paul Papak and Billy Williams
Case Number: 3:2019cv01988
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE TO NON-ADMITTED COUNSEL: This case has been transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon from the District of Columbia. Our records indicate that you are not admitted to practice in the District of Oregon. Admissions information is governed by #LR 83, and information about the admissions process is available on the #admissions page of the Court website. Related Document Case Transferred In - District Transfer #28 .. (eo)
December 6, 2019 Filing 29 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (eo)
December 6, 2019 Filing 28 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-01299. Electronic file received.
December 2, 2019 Case transferred to the USDC for the District of Oregon, pursuant to the Court Order entered 11/6/2019. Sent to Court via extraction. (ztth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
November 6, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 11/27/2019. (tj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION granting #13 Motion to Transfer Case. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/6/2019. (lcrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Transfer Case. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/6/2019. (lcrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying #23 Motion to Disqualify Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Court Judges. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/6/2019. (lcrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying #23 Motion to Disqualify Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Court Judges. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/6/2019. (lcrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Disqualify Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Court Judges by TIMOTHY ROTE. (ztth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY re #19 Memorandum in Opposition, (Reply in Further Support of the Oregon Judicial Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) filed by JAMES EGAN, ROBERT HERNDON, SUSIE NORBY, OREGON JUDICIAL DEPARTMENT. (Garrahan, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 22 MILITARY AFFIDAVIT in support of Motion for default #20 by TIMOTHY ROTE (ztd) Modified on 9/27/2019 (ztd). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Entry of Default by TIMOTHY ROTE (Attachment: #1 Exhibit - Attachments) "LET THIS BE FILED" by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/17/2019. (ztth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 19 Memorandum in opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Defendants' Oregon Judicial Department, Honorable Robert Herndon, Honorable Susie Norby, Honorable James Egan Motion to Dismiss) filed by TIMOTHY ROTE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(zjf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Defendants' Oregon Judicial Department, Honorable Robert Herndon, Honorable Susie Norby, Honorable James Egan Motion to Dismiss) by JAMES EGAN, ROBERT HERNDON, SUSIE NORBY, OREGON JUDICIAL DEPARTMENT (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Order)(Garrahan, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to opposition to motion re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by COMMITTEE ON JUDICIAL CONDUCT AND DISABILITY OF THE JUDICIAL CONFERENCE OF THE UNITED STATES, ROBERT KUGLER, PAUL PAPAK, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, BILLY WILLIAMS. (Cirino, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 Memorandum in opposition to re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by TIMOTHY ROTE. (jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The Federal Defendants need not respond to Plaintiff's Complaint until 21 days after the Court rules on their #13 Motion to Transfer. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on July 24, 2019. (lcrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by COMMITTEE ON JUDICIAL CONDUCT AND DISABILITY OF THE JUDICIAL CONFERENCE OF THE UNITED STATES, ROBERT KUGLER, PAUL PAPAK, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, BILLY WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension: It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants Oregon State Bar, Oregon State Bar Professional Liability Fund, and Carol Bernick need not respond to Plaintiff's Complaint until 21 days after the Court rules on the #13 Federal Defendants' Motion to Transfer. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on July 19, 2019. (lcrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by CAROL BERNICK, OREGON STATE BAR, OREGON STATE BAR AND PROFESSIONAL LIABILITY FUND (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Jeffrey) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Transfer Case by COMMITTEE ON JUDICIAL CONDUCT AND DISABILITY OF THE JUDICIAL CONFERENCE OF THE UNITED STATES, ROBERT KUGLER, PAUL PAPAK, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, BILLY WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/20/2019, (tj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants Oregon Judicial Department, Robert Herndon, Susie Norby, and James Egan shall have until August 20, 2019 to respond to the complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on July 11, 2019. (lcrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT re #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by JAMES EGAN, ROBERT HERNDON, SUSIE NORBY, OREGON JUDICIAL DEPARTMENT. (Garrahan, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by JAMES EGAN, ROBERT HERNDON, SUSIE NORBY, OREGON JUDICIAL DEPARTMENT (Attachments: #1 Attachment: Proposed Order)(Garrahan, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Andrew Garrahan on behalf of JAMES EGAN, ROBERT HERNDON, SUSIE NORBY, OREGON JUDICIAL DEPARTMENT (Garrahan, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/16/2019 (tj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants Oregon State Bar Professional Liability Fund and Carol Bernick shall have until August 16, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on July 8, 2019. (lcrc2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by CAROL BERNICK, OREGON STATE BAR AND PROFESSIONAL LIABILITY FUND (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Jeffrey) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. COLORADO JUDICIAL DEPARTMENT served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019; ELIZABETH WEISHAUPL served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JAMES EGAN served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; ROBERT HERNDON served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; SUSIE NORBY served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019; OREGON JUDICIAL DEPARTMENT served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CAROL BERNICK served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019; OREGON STATE BAR served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019; OREGON STATE BAR AND PROFESSIONAL LIABILITY FUND served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/13/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/12/2019. (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. COMMITTEE ON JUDICIAL CONDUCT AND DISABILITY OF THE JUDICIAL CONFERENCE OF THE UNITED STATES served on 6/11/2019; ROBERT KUGLER served on 6/11/2019; PAUL PAPAK served on 6/11/2019; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/11/2019; BILLY WILLIAMS served on 6/11/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/11/2019. (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of COMMITTEE ON JUDICIAL CONDUCT AND DISABILITY OF THE JUDICIAL CONFERENCE OF THE UNITED STATES, ROBERT KUGLER, PAUL PAPAK, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, BILLY WILLIAMS (Cirino, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for CM/ECF Password by TIMOTHY ROTE. (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number: 4616098004. (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
May 2, 2019 SUMMONS (16) Issued as to CAROL BERNICK, COLORADO JUDICIAL DEPARTMENT, COMMITTEE ON JUDICIAL CONDUCT AND DISABILITY OF THE JUDICIAL CONFERENCE OF THE UNITED STATES, WILLIAM B. CROW, JAMES EGAN, ROBERT HERNDON, ROBERT KUGLER, SUSIE NORBY, OREGON JUDICIAL DEPARTMENT, OREGON STATE BAR, OREGON STATE BAR AND PROFESSIONAL LIABILITY FUND, PAUL PAPAK, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, ELIZABETH WEISHAUPL, BILLY WILLIAMS, and U.S. Attorney. (tth); Modified date filed on 5/7/2019 (tth). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAROL BERNICK, COLORADO JUDICIAL DEPARTMENT, COMMITTEE ON JUDICIAL CONDUCT AND DISABILITY OF THE JUDICIAL CONFERENCE OF THE UNITED STATES, WILLIAM B. CROW, JOHN, 1-5 DOES, JAMES EGAN, ROBERT HERNDON, ROBERT KUGLER, SUSIE NORBY, OREGON JUDICIAL DEPARTMENT, OREGON STATE BAR, OREGON STATE BAR AND PROFESSIONAL LIABILITY FUND, PAUL PAPAK, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, ELIZABETH WEISHAUPL, BILLY WILLIAMS with Jury Demand filed by TIMOTHY ROTE. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tth) Modified date filed on 5/7/2019 (tth). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rote v. Committee on Judicial Conduct and Disability of the Judicial Conference of the United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH WEISHAUPL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon State Bar
Represented By: Jeffrey John Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSIE NORBY
Represented By: Paul Andrew Garrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM B. CROW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Bernick
Represented By: Jeffrey John Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT KUGLER
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Judicial Department
Represented By: Paul Andrew Garrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Herndon
Represented By: Paul Andrew Garrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMITTEE ON JUDICIAL CONDUCT AND DISABILITY OF THE JUDICIAL CONFERENCE OF THE UNITED STATES
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES EGAN
Represented By: Paul Andrew Garrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLORADO JUDICIAL DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN, 1-5 DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OREGON STATE BAR AND PROFESSIONAL LIABILITY FUND
Represented By: Jeffrey John Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Paul Papak
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Williams
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY C. ROTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?