A.B. v. Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: A B and A. B.
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Red Lion Hotels Corporation, Choice Hotels Corporation, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. and Extended Stay America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01992
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1595
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #11 . Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #10 . Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
February 4, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bethany K. Biesenthal. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6221849 #10 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicole M. Perry. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6221883 #11 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #10 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #11 .) (ecp)
February 3, 2020 Filing 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicole M. Perry. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6221883. Filed by Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (Pitzer, Jeff)
February 3, 2020 Filing 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bethany K. Biesenthal. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6221849. Filed by Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (Pitzer, Jeff)
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Kathryn Leigh Avila (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: klavila. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kathryn Avila for A. B.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6153437 issued. Signed on 1/14/2020 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (ecp)
January 13, 2020 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kathryn Leigh Avila . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6153437. Filed by A. B.. (Shapiro, Joel)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Kimberly Lambert Adams (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: kladams. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kimberly Lambert Adams for A. B.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6118355 issued. Signed on 12/12/2019 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (ecp)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kimberly Lambert Adams . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6118355. Filed by A. B.. (Shapiro, Joel)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Choice Hotels Corporation, Extended Stay America, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., Red Lion Hotels Corporation, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/8/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/8/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 5/8/2020. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (joha)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6113830 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by A. B. against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons). (Shapiro, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.B. v. Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Marie Perry
Represented By: Bethany K. Biesenthal
Represented By: Jeff S. Pitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Lion Hotels Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choice Hotels Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extended Stay America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A B
Represented By: Joel Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. B.
Represented By: Joel Shapiro
Represented By: Kimberly Lambert Adams
Represented By: Kathryn Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?