Portland Engineering, Inc. et al v. ATG Pharma Inc.
Plaintiff: Portland Engineering, Inc. and Thompson Duke Industrial, LLC
Defendant: ATG Pharma Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02010
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Referring Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by ATG Pharma Inc.. (Sutton, Randall)
February 7, 2020 Filing 19 Answer to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, Counterclaim Portland Engineering, Inc., Thompson Duke Industrial, LLC. Filed by ATG Pharma Inc.. (Sutton, Randall)
January 14, 2020 Filing 18 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Michael C. Gilchrist (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: mcgilchrist. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael C. Gilchrist for ATG Pharma Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6151607 issued. Signed on 1/14/2020 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp)
January 14, 2020 Filing 16 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Jonathan L. Kennedy (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: jlkennedy. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan L. Kennedy for ATG Pharma Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6151595 issued. Signed on 1/14/2020 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Acosta - GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #13 . Answer is due by 2/7/2020. (pjg)
January 13, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint,, #1 . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by ATG Pharma Inc.. (Sutton, Randall)
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael C. Gilchrist . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6151607. Filed by ATG Pharma Inc.. (Sutton, Randall)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan L. Kennedy . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6151595. Filed by ATG Pharma Inc.. (Sutton, Randall)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Jayashree Mitra (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: jmitra. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jayashree Mitra for Portland Engineering, Inc. and Thompson Duke Industrial, LLC. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6131573 issued. Signed on 1/3/2020 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp)
December 24, 2019 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #4 upon ATG Pharma Inc. served on 12/23/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (DeJong, Timothy)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jayashree Mitra . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6131573. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (DeJong, Timothy)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (eo)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 Patent Report: This report is submitted pursuant to 35 U.S.C. section 290, which requires the clerks of the courts of the United States, within one month after the filing of an action under this title shall give notice thereof in writing to the Commissioner, setting forth so far as known the names and addresses of the parties, name of the inventor, and the designating number of the patent upon which the action has been brought. If any other patent is subsequently included in the action he shall give like notice thereof. Within one month after the decision is rendered or a judgment issued the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director. The Director shall, on receipt of such notices, enter the same in the file of such patent.. (ecp)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to ATG Pharma Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/9/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/11/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 5/11/2020. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (DeJong, Timothy)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6116741 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Portland Engineering, Inc., Thompson Duke Industrial, LLC against All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Proposed Summons). (DeJong, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Portland Engineering, Inc. et al v. ATG Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Portland Engineering, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy S. DeJong
Represented By: Jayashree Mitra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thompson Duke Industrial, LLC
Represented By: Timothy S. DeJong
Represented By: Jayashree Mitra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATG Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Michael C. Gilchrist
Represented By: Randall P. Sutton
Represented By: Jonathan L. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?