Gabriel v. Broadspire Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Laura Gabriel
Defendant: Crawford & Company Inc and Broadspire Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02012
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Crawford & Company Inc waiver sent on 1/10/2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Gomm, Russell)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Broadspire Services, Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Gomm, Russell)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Broadspire Services, Inc., Crawford & Company Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/9/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/11/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 5/11/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (joha)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6116987 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Laura Gabriel against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons to Defendant Broadspire Services, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons to Defendant Crawford & Company, Inc.). (Gomm, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gabriel v. Broadspire Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crawford & Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadspire Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Gabriel
Represented By: Jose A. Klein
Represented By: Russell George Gomm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?