Dressler v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Plaintiff: Diane L. Dressler
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 3:2019cv02014
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 12 Joint Status Report . Filed by Diane L. Dressler. (Glor, Megan)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Telephonic Rule 16 Conference is set for 2/19/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Anna J. Brown. Before the Conference, at a minimum counsel must conduct real-time conferral by telephone to prepare a proposed case-management schedule to be submitted to the Court prior to the Rule 16 Conference. The parties shall submit a written joint status report (to include proposed case management schedule) no later than 2/13/2020 that include deadlines to complete discovery, to file dispositive motions, and for trial. Parties shall also determine whether they agree to forgo the disclosures required under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1), and file separately with the Clerk of Court the form required by LR 26-2 no later than 2/13/2020. (bb)
January 21, 2020 Filing 10 Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Diane L. Dressler. (Glor, Megan)
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #3 upon Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 12/13/2019 Filed by Diane L. Dressler. (Glor, Megan)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Iwana Rademaekers (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: irademaekers. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Iwana Rademaekers for Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6141958 issued. Signed on 1/6/2020 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Iwana Rademaekers . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6141958. Filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Schpak, Andrew)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Schpak, Andrew)
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Schpak, Andrew)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/9/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/11/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 5/11/2020. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sb)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6117768 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Diane L. Dressler against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Glor, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dressler v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Josh M. Goldberg
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Represented By: Andrew M. Schpak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane L. Dressler
Represented By: Megan E. Glor
Represented By: John C. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?