Levitt v. Upton et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Ray Levitt
Defendant: Wellpath Medical, Naphcare Medical, Washington County Sheriff's Office, Multnomah County Sherrifs Office, Multnomah County Jail Medical, Upton, Multnomah County Jail, Andrew Skinner and Columbia County Jail
Case Number: 3:2019cv02026
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO DISMISS: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint #2 is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. Should Plaintiff wish to continue with this case, he must file an amended complaint within 30 days. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed order and complaint form to Pro Se party on 1/22/2020.) (dsg)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL: Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel #3 is DENIED. Signed on 1/21/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 1/22/2020.) (dsg)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: IT IS ORDERED that the provisional in forma pauperis status given the Plaintiff is confirmed. This action may go forward without the payment of fees or costs. Signed on 1/21/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 1/22/2020.) (dsg)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 12/13/2019.) (joha)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Daniel Ray Levitt. (joha)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Daniel Ray Levitt against All Defendants. (joha)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Daniel Ray Levitt. (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levitt v. Upton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naphcare Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multnomah County Sherrifs Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multnomah County Jail Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multnomah County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ray Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?