Larrison v. Ocean Beauty Seafoods LLC et al
Plaintiff: Richard Larrison
Defendant: Mattsen Fisheries, Inc., Mattsen Management LLC, Ocean Beauty Seafoods LLC, Retriever Tender Alaska LLC, Mattsen Management, LLC, Retriever Tender Alaska, LLC and Ocean Beauty Seafoods, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02053
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Marine Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 11 Answer to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Mattsen Management, LLC. (Spivak, Svetlana)
January 15, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Mattsen Management, LLC. (Spivak, Svetlana)
January 15, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Svetlana P. Spivak is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Colin J. Folawn and Bert W. Markovich Filed by Mattsen Management, LLC. (Spivak, Svetlana)
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 Answer to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses of Mattsen Fisheries, Inc. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Mattsen Fisheries, Inc.. (Folawn, Colin)
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Mattsen Fisheries, Inc.. Filed by Mattsen Fisheries, Inc.. (Folawn, Colin)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance of Thomas G. Waller appearing on behalf of Ocean Beauty Seafoods, LLC, Retriever Tender Alaska, LLC Filed by on behalf of Ocean Beauty Seafoods, LLC, Retriever Tender Alaska, LLC. (Waller, Thomas)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance of Bert W. Markovich appearing on behalf of Mattsen Fisheries, Inc., Mattsen Management, LLC Filed by on behalf of Mattsen Fisheries, Inc., Mattsen Management, LLC. (Markovich, Bert)
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance of Colin J. Folawn appearing on behalf of Mattsen Fisheries, Inc., Mattsen Management, LLC Filed by on behalf of Mattsen Fisheries, Inc., Mattsen Management, LLC. (Folawn, Colin)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Mattsen Fisheries, Inc., Mattsen Management, LLC, Ocean Beauty Seafoods, LLC, Retriever Tender Alaska, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/17/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/18/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 5/18/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (joha)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6126440 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Richard Larrison against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Bunnell, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larrison v. Ocean Beauty Seafoods LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mattsen Fisheries, Inc.
Represented By: Bert W. Markovich
Represented By: Colin J. Folawn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mattsen Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Beauty Seafoods LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retriever Tender Alaska LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mattsen Management, LLC
Represented By: Colin J. Folawn
Represented By: Svetlana P. Spivak
Represented By: Bert W. Markovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retriever Tender Alaska, LLC
Represented By: Thomas G. Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Beauty Seafoods, LLC
Represented By: Thomas G. Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Larrison
Represented By: Gregory A. Bunnell
Represented By: Theodore P. Heus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?