Tomelleri v. Brookswood Property, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Joseph R Tomelleri
Defendant: Brookswood Property, L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02054
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 8 Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6210434. The request has been granted and the amount of $300.00 will be refunded to Phillip J. Haberthur Related Doc #6 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically,. (lp)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Scott J. Strohm's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. #5 ). Ordered on 2/5/2020 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott J. Strohm. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6210438 #5 . Filed by Joseph R Tomelleri. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1st Payment, #2 Attachment 2nd Payment) (Haberthur, Phillip)
February 5, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott J. Strohm. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6210438 #5 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #5 .) (ecp)
January 30, 2020 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott J. Strohm. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6210438. Filed by Joseph R Tomelleri. (Haberthur, Phillip)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (sb)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Brookswood Property, L.L.C. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/16/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/18/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 5/18/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (sb)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6126584 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included copyrights: VA 998 415--McCloud River Rainbow--Joseph R Tomelleri. Filed by Joseph R Tomelleri against Brookswood Property, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Attachment AO121). (Haberthur, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomelleri v. Brookswood Property, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookswood Property, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R Tomelleri
Represented By: Phillip J. Haberthur
Represented By: Scott Joseph Strohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?