Redmond v. Standard Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: Bryan Redmond
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company, Lisa McGillicuddy and Derek Schmalle
Case Number: 3:2019cv02061
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Derek Schmalle waiver sent on 1/13/2020. Filed by Bryan Redmond. (Rickles, Stephen)
January 14, 2020 Filing 6 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Standard Insurance Company waiver sent on 1/13/2020. Filed by Bryan Redmond. (Rickles, Stephen)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Lisa McGillicuddy, Derek Schmalle. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to defendant Lisa McGillicuddy Filed by Bryan Redmond. (Rickles, Stephen)
December 31, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to defendant Derek Schmalle Filed by Bryan Redmond. (Rickles, Stephen)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/17/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/18/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 5/18/2020. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6127930 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Bryan Redmond against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Rickles, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redmond v. Standard Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Redmond
Represented By: Martin William Jaqua
Represented By: Stephen P. Rickles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa McGillicuddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Schmalle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?