United States of America v. Piehl et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Estate of Claus K. Piehl and Heidi Piehl
Case Number: 3:2019cv02062
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Heidi Piehl waiver sent on 12/23/2019. Filed by United States of America. (Bourget, Boris)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/20/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/18/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 5/18/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (joha)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding Exhibit 2 to Complaint #1 . A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record.. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect exhibit. (joha)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)) Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by United States of America against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Bourget, Boris) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/19/2019) (joha).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Piehl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Claus K. Piehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Piehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Boris Bourget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?