Norman v. Wellpath, LLC et al
Plaintiff: The Estate of Kathleen Margaret Norman and Guy Ray Norman
Defendant: Wellpath, LLC, Tim Svenson, The Estate of Hal Mitchell, D.O., Providence Newberg Medical Center, Michael Petrasek, Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Sharon Southwick, Providence Health & Services - Oregon, Yamhill County, Barbara Shipley, Darla Pena, Richard Geist, Michael Brooks, John Does 1-9 and Erin K. Olson
Case Number: 3:2019cv02095
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Wellpath, LLC. (Smith, Vicki)
February 14, 2020 Filing 27 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Wellpath, LLC. (Smith, Vicki)
February 14, 2020 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Providence Health & Services - Oregon. (Neiman, Eric)
February 14, 2020 Filing 25 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Providence Health & Services - Oregon, Providence Newberg Medical Center. (Neiman, Eric)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Defendant Sharon Southwicks Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #22 is GRANTED. Defendant Southwicks responsive pleadings are now due 2/27/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
February 5, 2020 Filing 23 Declaration of Jamie E. Valentine In Support Of Unopposed Motion To Extend Time For Filing Responsive Pleading. Filed by Sharon Southwick. (Valentine, Jamie)
February 5, 2020 Filing 22 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time For Filing Responsive Pleading. Filed by Sharon Southwick. (Valentine, Jamie)
February 5, 2020 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance of Peter O. Tuenge appearing on behalf of Sharon Southwick Filed by on behalf of Sharon Southwick. (Tuenge, Peter)
February 5, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance of Jamie E. Valentine appearing on behalf of Sharon Southwick Filed by on behalf of Sharon Southwick. (Valentine, Jamie)
January 31, 2020 Filing 19 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Darla Pena waiver sent on 1/21/2020; Michael Petrasek waiver sent on 1/21/2020. Filed by Guy Ray Norman. (Kaplan, Matthew)
January 30, 2020 Filing 18 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #12 upon Sharon Southwick served on 1/16/2020 Filed by Guy Ray Norman. (Kaplan, Matthew)
January 21, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Association of Attorney Matthew D. Kaplan,John T. Devlin for Guy Ray Norman. Filed by Guy Ray Norman. (Kaplan, Matthew)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The court GRANTS Defendant Providence Health & Services Motion for Extension of Time #13 and Defendant Correct Care Solutions Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #15 . Both Defendants' answers to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 are now due 2/14/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
January 17, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Wellpath, LLC. (Smith, Vicki)
January 17, 2020 Filing 14 Declaration of Eric J. Neiman . Filed by Providence Health & Services - Oregon, Providence Newberg Medical Center. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time #13 .) (Neiman, Eric)
January 17, 2020 Filing 13 Motion for Extension of Time . Filed by Providence Health & Services - Oregon, Providence Newberg Medical Center. (Neiman, Eric)
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued Electronically as to Sharon Southwick. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Summons Filed by Guy Ray Norman. (Kaplan, Matthew)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Tim Svenson waiver sent on 12/30/2019; Yamhill County waiver sent on 12/30/2019; Richard Geist waiver sent on 12/30/2019; Barbara Shipley waiver sent on 12/30/2019; Michael Brooks waiver sent on 12/30/2019. Filed by Tim Svenson; Yamhill County; Richard Geist; Barbara Shipley; Michael Brooks. (Kraemer, Steven)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #5 upon Wellpath, LLC served on 1/2/2020 Filed by Guy Ray Norman. (Kaplan, Matthew) Modified on 1/10/2020 to correct event (jn). (Entered: 01/06/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #3 upon Providence Health & Services - Oregon served on 1/3/2020 Filed by Guy Ray Norman. (Kaplan, Matthew) Modified on 1/10/2020 to correct event (jn).
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #4 upon Correct Care Solutions, LLC served on 1/2/2020 Filed by Guy Ray Norman. (Kaplan, Matthew) Modified on 1/10/2020 to correct event (jn).
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Erin K. Olson waiver sent on 12/31/2019. Filed by Guy Ray Norman. (Kaplan, Matthew)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Wellpath, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Correct Care Solutions, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Providence Health & Services - Oregon. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/27/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/26/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 5/26/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (rs)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6133928 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by The Estate of Kathleen Margaret Norman against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons). (Kaplan, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman v. Wellpath, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath, LLC
Represented By: Vicki M. Smith
Represented By: Jamie T. Azevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Svenson
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Hal Mitchell, D.O.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Newberg Medical Center
Represented By: Emma P. Pelkey
Represented By: Eric J. Neiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Petrasek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Vicki M. Smith
Represented By: Jamie T. Azevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Southwick
Represented By: Peter O. Tuenge
Represented By: Jamie E. Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Health & Services - Oregon
Represented By: Emma P. Pelkey
Represented By: Eric J. Neiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yamhill County
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Shipley
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darla Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Geist
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Brooks
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin K. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Kathleen Margaret Norman
Represented By: Matthew D. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Ray Norman
Represented By: Matthew D. Kaplan
Represented By: John T. Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?