Wilson v. Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Plaintiff: Mary E. Wilson
Defendant: Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 3:2019cv02104
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2675
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Filing 10 Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement. Filed by Mary E. Wilson. (sb)
February 19, 2020 Filing 9 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (sb)
February 19, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Secretary of Veterans Affairs. (Summons, USM 285 form(s), and copies of the Complaint and Order to Proceed in forma pauperis forwarded to the U.S. Marshals Service for service.) (fp)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The deadline for Plaintiff to prepare summons was due 1/30/2020, per this Courts Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #4 . To date, Plaintiff has failed to provide the court with summons and USM 285 forms. Therefore, Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The deadline to respond to this order is 02/28/2020. Failure to respond to this order will result in this case being dismissed with prejudice. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman.(Mailed to Pro Se party on 2/7/2020.) (kms)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Mary E. Wilson regarding Order on motion/application for leave to proceed IFP #4 . (sb)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/5/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/4/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 6/4/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 1/6/2020.) (sb)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: GRANTING Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 12/31/19.) (dls)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 12/30/2019.) (jn)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Mary E. Wilson. (jn)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Mary E. Wilson against Secretary of Veterans Affairs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (jn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary E. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?