Steiert v. Foster Farms LLC
Plaintiff: Richard Steiert
Defendant: Foster Poultry Farms, Inc. and Foster Farms LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00016
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Filing 9 Joint Status Report and Proposed Case Management Schedule. Filed by All Defendants. (Kotori, Blerina)
March 5, 2020 Filing 8 Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Foster Farms LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Inc.. (Kotori, Blerina)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Telephonic Rule 16 Conference is SET for 3/10/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Anna J. Brown. Before the Conference, at a minimum counsel must conduct real-time conferral by telephone to prepare a proposed case-management schedule to be submitted to the Court prior to the Rule 16 Conference. The parties shall submit a written joint status report (to include proposed case management schedule) no later than 3/5/20 that include deadlines to complete discovery, to file dispositive motions, and for trial. Parties shall also determine whether they agree to forgo the disclosures required under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1), and file separately with the Clerk of Court the form required by LR 26-2 no later than 3/5/20. (bb)
February 6, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Kotori, Blerina)
February 6, 2020 Filing 5 Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Foster Poultry Farms, Inc., Foster Farms LLC. (Kotori, Blerina)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service upon All Defendants Filed by Richard Steiert. (Wilson, Eric)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs) (Main Document 3 replaced on 1/14/2020) (eo).
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/5/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/4/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 6/4/2020. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (rs)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. and Demand for Jury Trial Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6142812 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Richard Steiert against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Wilson, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steiert v. Foster Farms LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Poultry Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Blerina Kotori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Farms LLC
Represented By: Blerina Kotori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Steiert
Represented By: Robert K. Meyer
Represented By: Eric D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?