Rosenberry et al v. Roberti et al
Plaintiff: Stacey Coffey, Oliver Coffey and Suzanne Rosenberry
Defendant: John Roberti, Jr, Marco Roberti, Suzanne Roberti and Roberti Food, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00026
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Joint Motion to Stay and Toll #10 is granted. The court stays all deadlines in the case pending the outcome of mediation (including defendants' first appearance deadline of January 14, 2020) until 30 days following the mediation; and tolls the absent collective members' statutes of limitations from January 14, 2020 until 30 days following the mediation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed on 1/14/2020 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 14, 2020 Filing 10 Joint Motion for Stay and Toll. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Egan, Jon)
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Egan, Jon)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 5/13/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/12/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (jn)
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTES of Proceedings: Defendants' Motion to Quash #3 is GRANTED. The subpoenas issued to Wells Fargo and U.S. Bank are overly broad. The parties shall engage in other methods of discovery. Jon M. Egan present as counsel for plaintiffs. Mark A. Crabree present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: FTR - 12B. Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You presiding. (pvh)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Scheduling Order: SETTING a Telephonic Hearing for Friday, January 10, 2020 at 2:00PM (by telephone), before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You regarding Defendants' Motion to Quash, Alternative Motion for Protective Order #3 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 Declaration of Mark Crabtree . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Quash, Motion for Protective Order #3 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Crabtree, Mark)
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 Declaration of Suzanne Roberti . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Quash, Motion for Protective Order #3 .) (Crabtree, Mark)
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 Motion to Quash , Alternative Motion for Protective Order . Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Crabtree, Mark)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Roberti Food, LLC. (Crabtree, Mark)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19cv51287 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6144538 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Marco Roberti, Suzanne Roberti, Roberti Food, LLC, John Roberti, Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Crabtree, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosenberry et al v. Roberti et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Coffey
Represented By: Jon M. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oliver Coffey
Represented By: Jon M. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Rosenberry
Represented By: Jon M. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Roberti, Jr
Represented By: Kira J. Johal
Represented By: Mark A. Crabtree
Represented By: Daniel J. Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marco Roberti
Represented By: Kira J. Johal
Represented By: Mark A. Crabtree
Represented By: Daniel J. Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Roberti
Represented By: Kira J. Johal
Represented By: Mark A. Crabtree
Represented By: Daniel J. Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberti Food, LLC
Represented By: Kira J. Johal
Represented By: Mark A. Crabtree
Represented By: Daniel J. Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?