International Gold Star, Inc. v. Global Importing Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: International Gold Star, Inc.
Defendant: Global Importing Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00197
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Global Importing Group, Inc.. (Galm, Paul)
February 28, 2020 Filing 7 Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Global Importing Group, Inc.. (Galm, Paul)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #5 upon Global Importing Group, Inc. served on 2/7/2020 Filed by International Gold Star, Inc.. (Kolitch, Shawn)
February 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Global Importing Group, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 Trademark Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to Title 15 Section 1116(c), which states that it shall be the duty of the clerks of such courts within one month after the filing of any action give notice thereof in writing to the Director setting forth in order so far as known the names and addresses of the litigants and the designating number or numbers of the registration or registrations upon which the action, suit, or proceeding has been brought, and in the event any other registration be subsequently included in the action, suit, or proceeding by amendment, answer, or other pleading, the clerk shall give like notice thereof to the Director, and within one month after the judgment is entered or an appeal is taken the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director, and it shall be the duty of the Director on receipt of such notice forthwith to endorse the same upon the file wrapper of the said registration or registrations and to incorporate the same as a part of the contents of said file wrapper.. (jn)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/5/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/6/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 7/6/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (jn)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by International Gold Star, Inc.. (Kolitch, Shawn)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6234460 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included patents/trademarks: 4,123,729--4/10/2012--Carlsberg Ukraine. Filed by International Gold Star, Inc. against Global Importing Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons). (Kolitch, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Gold Star, Inc. v. Global Importing Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Gold Star, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn J. Kolitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Importing Group, Inc.
Represented By: Paul C. Galm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?