United States of America v. Kiraz et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 17544 SE Stark St., Portland, Oregon 97233, Unknown Parties and George D. Kiraz
Case Number: 3:2020cv00238
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #5 upon 17544 SE Stark St., Portland, Oregon 97233 served on 3/4/2020 Filed by United States of America. (Bickers, Kathleen)
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #5 upon George D. Kiraz served on 3/1/2020 Filed by United States of America. (Bickers, Kathleen)
March 4, 2020 Filing 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Complaint #1 . Filed by George D. Kiraz. (sss)
March 4, 2020 Filing 7 Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel. Filed by George D. Kiraz. (sss)
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to 17544 SE Stark St., Portland, Oregon 97233, George D. Kiraz. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/17/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/17/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 7/17/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (jtj)
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons for 17544 SE Stark St., Portland, OR 97233 Filed by United States of America. (Bickers, Kathleen)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons for George D. Kiraz Filed by United States of America. (Bickers, Kathleen)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)) Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by United States of America against 17544 SE Stark St., Portland, Oregon 97233, George D. Kiraz, Unknown Parties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Bickers, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Kiraz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 17544 SE Stark St., Portland, Oregon 97233
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George D. Kiraz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kathleen Louise Bickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?