Wadley et al v. Durham et al
Plaintiff: Colleen Wadley and Tracy Wadley
Defendant: Hirequest Inc., Daren Durham, Pacific Auto Transport, Covey Auto Express Inc. and Command Center Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00243
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
March 30, 2020 Filing 9 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand , Crossclaim against Defendant Command Center Inc.. Filed by Covey Auto Express Inc.. (Williams, Brian)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Association of Attorney Cameron Soran,Cameron Soran,Cameron Soran for Tracy Wadley,Cameron Soran,Cameron Soran for Colleen Wadley. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Soran, Cameron)
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 Answer to Complaint Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 . Filed by Command Center Inc.. (McLellan, Ryan)
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Covey Auto Express Inc.. (Williams, Brian)
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by Daren Durham. (Mandt, Heidi)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 6/15/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/13/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 7/13/2020. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (joha)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by Command Center Inc.. (McLellan, Ryan)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Command Center Inc., Hirequest Inc.. (McLellan, Ryan)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV02047 from Multnomah Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6270013 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Command Center Inc., Hirequest Inc.. (McLellan, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wadley et al v. Durham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hirequest Inc.
Represented By: Ryan J. McLellan
Represented By: Sean K. Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daren Durham
Represented By: Heidi L. Mandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Auto Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covey Auto Express Inc.
Represented By: Brian B. Williams
Represented By: Tomas Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Command Center Inc.
Represented By: Ryan J. McLellan
Represented By: Sean K. Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Wadley
Represented By: Cameron Soran
Represented By: M. Casey Gibbens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Wadley
Represented By: Cameron Soran
Represented By: M. Casey Gibbens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?