USA v. 722 NE Skidmore Street, Portland
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 722 NE Skidmore Street, Portland, Multnomah County, State and District of Oregon and Frederick Homes LLC
Claimant: Lisa Howard
Case Number: 3:2020cv00313
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Filing 14 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand . Filed by Frederick Homes LLC, Lisa Howard. (Engle, Barry)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting Motion #12 for a Protective Order and entering Protective Order. Signed on 3/24/2020 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (slm)
March 24, 2020 Filing 12 Motion for Protective Order as to Declaration of Special Agent Scott McGeachy. Filed by United States of America. (Cardani, Christopher)
March 10, 2020 Filing 10 Claim . Filed by Lisa Howard, Frederick Homes LLC. Answer is due by 3/31/2020. (Engle, Barry)
March 3, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture Against Real Property Filed by United States of America. (Cardani, Christopher)
March 3, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Lis Pendens by United States of America Filed by United States of America. (Cardani, Christopher)
February 26, 2020 Filing 11 (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL), Declaration of SA McGeachy filed in support of Complaint #1 . Filed by United States of America. (slm)
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 Writ of Entry issued. Signed by Judge Anna J. Brown. (slm)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Writ of Entry #3 . Writ to issue. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (slm)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Motion #2 for Order to Seal and File ex parte the Declaration of SA McGeachy in Support of Complaint, in rem. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (slm)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Anna J. Brown. (joha)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Writ of Entry . Filed by USA. (Cardani, Christopher)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 Motion for Order to Seal and File ex parte the Declaration of SA McGeachy in Support of Complaint, in rem, for Forfeiture. Filed by USA. (Cardani, Christopher)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Complaint, in rem, for Forfeiture. (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)) Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by USA against 722 NE SKIDMORE STREET, PORTLAND, MULTNOMAH COUNTY, STATE AND DISTRICT OF OREGON, REAL PROPERTY WITH ITS BUILDINGS, APPURTENANCES AND IMPROVEMENTS, in rem (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Cardani, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. 722 NE Skidmore Street, Portland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 722 NE Skidmore Street, Portland, Multnomah County, State and District of Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Homes LLC
Represented By: Barry W. Engle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher L. Cardani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lisa Howard
Represented By: Barry W. Engle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?