Garden v. State of Oregon et al
Petitioner: George Garden
Respondent: Clackamas County Circuit Court and State of Oregon
Case Number: 3:2020cv00503
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Order to Show Cause #6 sent to George Garden returned as undeliverable. (joha)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS ORDERED that petitioner must file a notice of change of address within 60 days of the date of this Order or show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Petitioner is advised that failure to file a change of address or otherwise show cause will result in the dismissal of this proceeding for lack of prosecution. Signed on 4/7/2020 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 4/7/2020.) (joha)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Order to Show Cause #3 sent to George Garden returned as undeliverable. (joha)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Case Assignment Notice #2 sent to George Garden returned as undeliverable. (joha)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS ORDERED that petitioner must show cause in writing within 60 days of the date of this Order why the court should not summarily dismiss his Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed on 3/27/2020 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 3/27/2020.) (dsg)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 3/27/2020.) (joha)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State) Filing Fee in amount of $5.00 collected. Receipt No. 88162 issued. Filed by George Garden against Clackamas County Circuit Court, State of Oregon. (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garden v. State of Oregon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: George Garden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Clackamas County Circuit Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?