Mullins v. Valvoline LLC
Plaintiff: Jeremy Mullins
Defendant: Valvoline LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00504
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTES of Proceedings: Rule 16 Telephone Conference held. Add Parties/Amend Complaint by 7/20/2020. Discovery is to be completed by 9/1/2020. Dispositive Motions are due by 10/30/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report and Pretrial Order is due by 10/30/2020, if no dispositive motions are filed, or 30 days after the Court rules on any dispositive motion. Oral Argument is set for 1/11/2021 at 03:00PM in Portland Courtroom 15A before Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Pretrial Conference is set for 5/3/2021 at 10:00AM in Portland Courtroom 15A before Judge Marco A. Hernandez. 3-4 day Jury Trial is set for 5/11/2021 at 09:00AM in Portland Courtroom 15A before Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Daniel J. Snyder present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Alexander Wheatley and Thomas Birchfield, Sr. present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Nancy Walker. Judge Marco A. Hernandez presiding. (jp)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Scheduling Order by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. A Rule 16 Telephone Conference is set for 5/21/2020 at 02:30PM before Judge Marco A. Hernandez. The parties shall call into the Court's conference line (the phone number provided via separate email) five minutes prior to the scheduled conference time. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
May 15, 2020 Filing 10 Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan by All Defendants. Filed by All Defendants. (Wheatley, Alexander)
April 28, 2020 Filing 9 Amended Answer to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Counterclaim All Defendants. Filed by Valvoline LLC. (Wheatley, Alexander)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #7 . Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
April 20, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney(s) Alexander A. Wheatley,Thomas J. Birchfield, Sr for Valvoline LLC. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6562363 #7 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney(s) Alexander A. Wheatley,Thomas J. Birchfield, Sr for Valvoline LLC. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6562363. Filed by All Defendants. (Wheatley, Alexander)
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Wheatley, Alexander)
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, Counterclaim All Defendants. Filed by Valvoline LLC. (Wheatley, Alexander)
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service upon Valvoline LLC served on 3/30/2020 Filed by Jeremy Mullins. (Snyder, Daniel)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Valvoline LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 7/24/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/24/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 8/24/2020. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (sb)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6453278 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Jeremy Mullins against Valvoline LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Snyder, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mullins v. Valvoline LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Mullins
Represented By: John D. Burgess
Represented By: Carl Lee Post
Represented By: Daniel J. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valvoline LLC
Represented By: Alexander A. Wheatley
Represented By: Thomas J. Birchfield, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?