Szanto v. Szanto et al
Appellee: Evye Szanto, Victor Szanto, Mariette Szanto, Nicole Szanto, Barbara Szanto Alexander, Kimberley Szanto, John Barlow, Anthony Szanto and Austin Bell
Trustee: Stephen P. Arnot
Appellant: Peter Szanto
Case Number: 3:2020cv00533
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeals Rule 28 USC 158
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER - After considering the briefing schedule for all appeals before this Court involving Appellant, the Court sets the following briefing schedule for this case: Appellant's opening brief due October 19, 2010; Appellees' response brief due November 16, 2020; and Appellant's reply brief due December 18, 2020. Extensions will be disfavored because this briefing schedule is part of a global schedule. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
May 15, 2020 Filing 10 Report Regarding: Timing of Briefing. Filed by Peter Szanto. (Szanto, Peter)
May 11, 2020 Filing 9 Transmittal of Record for Bankruptcy Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Record on Appeal) (eo)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Appellant's Motion for Declaratory Order (ECF #7 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. The court has already stated that Appellant may file as an amendment to the appeal in this case the appeal of any order by the Bankruptcy Court denying his motion for reconsideration of the order and judgment imposing sanctions, which is the subject of the appeal in this case, without paying an additional appellate fee. See ECF #6 at 2. Additionally, the parties are ordered to confer and submit by May 15, 2020, either a joint or separate proposed schedule for briefing the merits of this appeal. The parties should take into consideration the existing briefing schedule of the other cases involving Mr. Szanto, but ensure that all briefing is completed before the end of the calendar year. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 Motion for Declaration Regarding Appellate Fee. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Peter Szanto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1st Judgment, #2 Exhibit 2nd Judgment, #3 Exhibit Appeal's Fee Paid, #4 Exhibit 1st Motion Relief from Judgment, #5 Exhibit 2nd Motion Relief from Judgment, #6 Exhibit Relief Denied) (Szanto, Peter)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Appellant's motion (ECF #5 ) to abate the deadline to pay the filing fee is DENIED. Signed on 4/13/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to Abate Appellate Fee Pending Motions In Bankruptcy Court. Filed by Peter Szanto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judgment A, #2 Exhibit Judgment B) (Szanto, Peter)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael H. Simon. (eo)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Judge Michael H. Simon: Plaintiff filed a document titled Second Amended Notice of Appeal with the bankruptcy court. The Court has reviewed the filing and has determined that the filing is a new appeal, not an amended notice of appeal, as it seeks review of a new order which was not previously appealed. The notice was forwarded to the District Court and assigned this number per Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8003(d)(2). Appellant is ordered to pay the appropriate fee with the bankruptcy court in order to continue this appeal. Appellant has previously been authorized to electronically file as a registered user, and it is hereby ordered that that authorization will be extended to this case upon transmittal of the record from the bankruptcy court. Appellants e-mail address will be added to this case until transmittal to facilitate service. (eo)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Referral of Appeal to USDC. (eo)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Appeal and Optional Statement of Election to District Court. Bankruptcy Court Case Number: 16-ap-3114. No Filling Fee has been paid. Filed by Peter Szanto. (eo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Szanto v. Szanto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Evye Szanto
Represented By: Nicholas J. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Victor Szanto
Represented By: Nicholas J. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mariette Szanto
Represented By: Nicholas J. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Nicole Szanto
Represented By: Nicholas J. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Barbara Szanto Alexander
Represented By: Nicholas J. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kimberley Szanto
Represented By: Nicholas J. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John Barlow
Represented By: Nicholas J. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Anthony Szanto
Represented By: Nicholas J. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Austin Bell
Represented By: Nicholas J. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Stephen P. Arnot
Represented By: Gary L. Blacklidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Peter Szanto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?