McCrary v. Wingfeild et al
Plaintiff: Dathan Jude McCrary, Sr
Defendant: Amy Holmes Hehn, Derek L. Carmon, Davonne R. Zentner, Kenneth Duilio, Ryan Espana, Jerry Ables, Larry Wingfeild, Steven Wilbon, Andy G. Polas, Cristin P. Bolles and Gene L. Balcomb
Case Number: 3:2020cv00534
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Filing 11 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment and Motion for Reconsideration. Filed by Dathan Jude McCrary, Sr.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Dathan McCrary, Prisoner ID: 21780348) (dsg)
May 8, 2020 Filing 10 JUDGMENT: This action is DISMISSED. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Dathan McCrary, Prisoner ID: 21780348) (dsg)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IFP AND DISMISSING CASE: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In forma Pauperis #1 is GRANTED, and his Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Entry of Default #3 , #6 are DENIED. Plaintiff fails to state a claim on which relief may be granted, and this action is DISMISSED. Any appeal from this Order or Judgment dismissing this action would be frivolous and not taken in good faith, and plaintiff's IFP status is REVOKED. Signed on 5/8/2020 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Dathan McCrary, Prisoner ID: 21780348) (dsg)
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 Declaration of Dathan Jude McCray as to Military Service. Filed by Dathan Jude McCrary, Sr. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Dathan McCrary, Prisoner ID: 21780348) (dsg)
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 Declaration of Dathan Jude McCray. Filed by Dathan Jude McCrary, Sr. (Related document(s): Motion for default #6 .)**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Dathan McCrary, Prisoner ID: 21780348) (dsg)
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 Motion for Entry of Default. Filed by Dathan Jude McCrary, Sr.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Dathan McCrary, Prisoner ID: 21780348) (dsg)
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 Affidavit of Dathan Jude McCrary Showing Facts of Default for Order on Default and Declaration. Filed by Dathan Jude McCrary, Sr. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Dathan McCrary, Prisoner ID: 21780348) (dsg)
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Ann L. Aiken. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Dathan McCrary, Prisoner ID: 21780348) (joha)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Dathan Jude McCrary, Sr.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Dathan McCrary, Prisoner ID: 21780348) (joha)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Dathan Jude McCrary, Sr against Jerry Ables, Gene L. Balcomb, Cristin P. Bolles, Derek L. Carmon, Kenneth Duilio, Ryan Espana, Amy Holmes Hehn, Andy G. Polas, Steven Wilbon, Larry Wingfeild, Davonne R. Zentner (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summonses).**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Dathan McCrary, Prisoner ID: 21780348) (joha)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Dathan Jude McCrary, Sr.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Dathan McCrary, Prisoner ID: 21780348) (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCrary v. Wingfeild et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Holmes Hehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek L. Carmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davonne R. Zentner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Duilio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Espana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Ables
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Wingfeild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Wilbon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy G. Polas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cristin P. Bolles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene L. Balcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dathan Jude McCrary, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?