Garan, Incorporated et al v. Manimal, LLC
Plaintiff: Garan, Incorporated and Garan Services Corporation
Defendant: Manimal, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00623
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Good cause being shown, it is therefore, ORDERED that the answer date in this matter is extended to June 30, 2020. Signed on 6/12/20 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
June 11, 2020 Filing 12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint,, #1 . Filed by Manimal, LLC. (Endejan, Judith)
June 5, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance of Judith A. Endejan appearing on behalf of Manimal, LLC Filed by on behalf of Manimal, LLC. (Endejan, Judith)
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service upon Manimal, LLC served on 5/18/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Klein, Steven)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #8 . Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
April 21, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney(s) L. Danielle Toaltoan.. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6571080 #8 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney(s) L. Danielle Toaltoan. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6571080. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Klein, Steven) Modified on 4/21/2020 to correct text to reflect pro hac vice counsel(ecp).
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #6 . Signed on 4/20/20 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy)
April 20, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney(s) Steven E. Klein. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6557222 #6 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney(s) G.Roxanne Elings. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6557222. Filed by Garan Services Corporation, Garan, Incorporated. (Klein, Steven) Modified on 4/20/2020 (ecp) to correct docket text.
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 Trademark Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to Title 15 Section 1116(c), which states that it shall be the duty of the clerks of such courts within one month after the filing of any action give notice thereof in writing to the Director setting forth in order so far as known the names and addresses of the litigants and the designating number or numbers of the registration or registrations upon which the action, suit, or proceeding has been brought, and in the event any other registration be subsequently included in the action, suit, or proceeding by amendment, answer, or other pleading, the clerk shall give like notice thereof to the Director, and within one month after the judgment is entered or an appeal is taken the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director, and it shall be the duty of the Director on receipt of such notice forthwith to endorse the same upon the file wrapper of the said registration or registrations and to incorporate the same as a part of the contents of said file wrapper. (Attachments: #1 AO 120 Attachment) (joha)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Manimal, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 8/14/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/14/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 9/14/2020. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (joha)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Garan Services Corporation, Garan, Incorporated. (Klein, Steven)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6550379 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included patents/trademarks: 85511299--1/8/2012--Manimal, LLC, 88833017--3/13/2020--Garan Services Corp., 88816999--3/2/2020--Garan Services Corp., 88817010--3/2/2020--Garan Services Corp., 88817070--3/2/2020--Garan Services Corp.. Filed by Garan, Incorporated, Garan Services Corporation against Manimal, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 AO120 Trademark Form). (Klein, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garan, Incorporated et al v. Manimal, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manimal, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garan, Incorporated
Represented By: Steven E. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garan Services Corporation
Represented By: Steven E. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?