Smith v. Cigna Health & Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Perry McCoy Smith
Defendant: Cigna Health & Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00624
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #4 . Defendant's Response/Answer is due by 7/7/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (jp)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer , Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Appear. Filed by All Defendants. (McCracken, Christopher)
May 12, 2020 Filing 3 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Cigna Health & Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 4/17/2020. Filed by Perry McCoy Smith. (Bordelon, Jeremy)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 8/14/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/14/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 9/14/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (sb)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6550531 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Perry McCoy Smith against Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit "A" Sample Approvals, #3 Exhibit "B" Summary of Unpaid Claims, #4 Exhibit "C" Unpaid ABA Bill, #5 Exhibit "D" Unpaid SLP Bill, #6 Exhibit "E" Champion Initial Letter, #7 Exhibit "F" Champion Final Letter). (Bordelon, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Cigna Health & Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry McCoy Smith
Represented By: Jeremy L. Bordelon
Represented By: Perry McCoy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Health & Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeremy L. Bordelon
Represented By: Christopher F. McCracken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?