Alvarez v. Progistics Distribution, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anibal Alvarez
Defendant: Amazon Logistics, Inc. and Progistics Distribution, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00741
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:207
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Progistics Distribution, Inc. waiver sent on 5/26/2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Marin, Lizeth)
June 1, 2020 Filing 5 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Amazon Logistics, Inc. waiver sent on 5/18/2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Marin, Lizeth)
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
May 11, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Filed by Anibal Alvarez. (Marin, Lizeth)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/2/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/2/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 10/2/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (ecp)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6651484 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Anibal Alvarez against Progistics Distribution, Inc., amazon logistics, inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Marin, Lizeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez v. Progistics Distribution, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anibal Alvarez
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Lizeth Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progistics Distribution, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?