Gahano v. Popoff
Petitioner: Denge Lemo Gahano
Respondent: Christine Popoff
Case Number: 3:2020cv00747
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. The Court DENIES as moot Gahano's application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #2 ) because he has paid the filing fee, and GRANTS Gahano's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #3 ). Gahano must show cause in writing within thirty days of date of this Order why the Court should not dismiss his petition for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. To assist him in making that showing, the Court appoints the Federal Public Defender, 101 S.W. Main Street, Suite 1700, Portland, Oregon 97204, to represent Gahano in this proceeding for the limited purpose described herein. Signed on 6/24/2020 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Attachment #1 Petition) (Mailed to Petitioner on 6/25/2020.) (gw)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 5/7/2020.) (dsg)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Denge Lemo Gahano. (dsg)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Denge Lemo Gahano. (dsg)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State) Filing Fee in amount of $5.00 collected. Receipt No. 88612 issued. Filed by Denge Lemo Gahano against Christine Popoff. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gahano v. Popoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christine Popoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Denge Lemo Gahano
Represented By: Lisa Hay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?