Karsten v. McDougall & Sons
Plaintiff: Sasha Jaidyn Karsten
Defendant: McDougall & Sons
Case Number: 3:2020cv00748
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 17 Clerk's Notice of Disbursement to Sasha Jaidyn Karsten, in the amount of $400.00. Check number 15128067, dated 06/23/2020 (Related Document: Order of Distribution of Funds #10 .). (lp)
June 24, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by McDougall & Sons. (Ames, Sarah)
June 24, 2020 Filing 15 Declaration of Sarah E. Ames in support of Motion to Dismiss based on Personal Jurisdiction. Filed by McDougall & Sons. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction #13 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Ames, Sarah)
June 24, 2020 Filing 14 Declaration of Irene Birdsall in support of Motion to Dismiss based on Personal Jurisdiction. Filed by McDougall & Sons. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction #13 .) (Ames, Sarah)
June 24, 2020 Filing 13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction). Oral Argument requested. Filed by McDougall & Sons. (Ames, Sarah)
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 Clerk's Notice of Mailing blank summons and USM-285 forms to Sasha Jaidyn Karsten, 30110 SW Brown Road, Apt.24, Wilsonville, OR 97070. (pvh)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #6 . Signed on 6/12/2020 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Signed on 6/11/2020 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting #8 Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 6/01/2020.) (pvh)
June 1, 2020 Filing 8 Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party. Filed by Sasha Jaidyn Karsten. (sss)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Service by Sasha Jaidyn Karsten of Complaint #1 Filed by Sasha Jaidyn Karsten. (eo)
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Sasha Jaidyn Karsten. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (eo)
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Mailing CM/ECF Application Form for Self-Represented Party to Sasha Jaidyn Karsten. (pvh)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice to Self-Represented Litigants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 5/22/2020.) (pvh)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/18/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/19/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 5/21/2020.) (jtj)
May 12, 2020 Filing fee in amount of $400.00 collected; Receipt No. 88688 issued. (re)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 5/7/20.) (eo)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Sasha Jaidyn Karsten against McDougall & Sons. (Attachments: #1 EEOC 161, #2 Updated Tolling Agreement, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet). (eo) NOTE: Received electronically per Standing Order 2020-8. Plaintiff has indicated the filing fee is forthcoming by U.S. Mail.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karsten v. McDougall & Sons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDougall & Sons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sasha Jaidyn Karsten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?