Lofgren v. Cozzone et al
Plaintiff: Kristofor Lofgren
Defendant: BCIP Double Impact Associates, L.P., Kitchen Fund, LP, Sustainable Restaurant Holdings, Inc., Bain Capital Double Impact Fund, LP and Christopher Cozzone
Case Number: 3:2020cv00784
Filed: May 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Referring Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss all claims against Defendants Christopher Cozzone, Bain Capital Double Impact Fund, LP, BCIP Double Impact Associates, L.P., and Kitchen Fund, LP (ECF No. #16 ) and without notice to shareholders is GRANTED. All pending motions are DENIED as MOOT. The court acknowledges receipt of Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal of All Claims against Defendant Restaurant Holdings, Inc. (ECF No. [15). Therefore, Plaintiff's action is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. DATED thhis 23rd day of June, 2020 by United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (pjg)
June 22, 2020 Filing 17 Response to Joint Motion to Change or Transfer Venue #5 . Filed by Kristofor Lofgren. (Gallegos, Stanton)
June 22, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Titled "Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss All Claims Against The Bain Defendants Without Prejudice". Filed by Kristofor Lofgren. (Gallegos, Stanton)
June 22, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Dismissal of Party Titled: "Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal of All Claims Against Defendant Sustainable Restaurant Holdings, Inc." Filed by Kristofor Lofgren. (Gallegos, Stanton)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Acosta: GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time #13 . The Court extends the following deadlines: (1) Plaintiff shall file (a) any jurisdictional motions, including any motion to remand and/or motion to abstain, and (b) his opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer [Dkt. 5] by no later than June 22, 2020. (2) Defendants shall file (a) their opposition to Plaintiff's jurisdictional motion(s), and (b) any reply in support of their Motion to Transfer by no later than July 13, 2020. (3) Plaintiff shall file his reply in support of any jurisdictional motions by no later than July 27, 2020. (4) Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint [Dkt. 1, Exhibit B] no later than 20 days after issuance of a ruling on the merits of (a) Plaintiff's jurisdictional motions and (b) Defendants' Motion to Transfer. (pjg)
June 12, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Extend Briefing Schedule. Filed by Kristofor Lofgren. (Gallegos, Stanton) Modified on 6/16/2020 to correct filing event (sb).
June 5, 2020 Filing 12 Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6694968. The request has been granted and the amount of $400.00 will be refunded to Per A. Ramfjord Related Doc #8 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically,. (lp)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Acosta: GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time #10 . The Court sets the following deadlines: (1) Plaintiff shall file (a) any jurisdictional motions, including any motion to remand and/or motion to abstain, and (b) his opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer [Dkt. 5] by no later than June 15, 2020. (2) Defendants shall file (a) their opposition to Plaintiff's jurisdictional motion(s), and (b) any reply in support of their Motion to Transfer by no later than July 6, 2020. (3) Plaintiff shall file his reply in support of any jurisdictional motions by no later than July 20, 2020. Pending completion of this briefing, the Court EXTENDS the time for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint [Dkt. 1, Exhibit B]. Defendants' pleading responsive to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint shall be due no later than 20 days after issuance of a ruling on the merits of (1) Plaintiff's jurisdictional motions and (2) Defendants' Motion to Transfer. (pjg)
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and to Set Briefing Schedule for Jurisdictional and Venue Motions. Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ramfjord, Per)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Acosta: GRANTING Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #7 by Jordan D. Weiss. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6719371. (pjg)
May 19, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Refund Request Due, 2 , Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by BCIP Double Impact Associates, L.P., Bain Capital Double Impact Fund, LP, Christopher Cozzone, Kitchen Fund, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B) (Ramfjord, Per)
May 19, 2020 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jordan D. Weiss. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6719371. Filed by BCIP Double Impact Associates, L.P., Christopher Cozzone, Kitchen Fund, LP, Bain Capital Double Impact Fund, LP. (Ramfjord, Per)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Scheduling Order by Judge Acosta - Motion is taken under advisement as of 8/3/2020. Request for oral argument will be considered in due course. (pjg)
May 19, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jordan D. Weiss. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6719371 #7 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 Joint Motion to Change or Transfer Venue . Oral Argument requested. Filed by BCIP Double Impact Associates, L.P., Bain Capital Double Impact Fund, LP, Christopher Cozzone, Kitchen Fund, LP, Sustainable Restaurant Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D) (Ramfjord, Per)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (eo)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 9/11/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/13/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 10/13/2020. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sb)
May 14, 2020 Filing 2 A duplicate payment in the amount of $400.00 was submitted by BCIP Double Impact Associates, L.P., et al in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court website. Refund Request is Due 5/26/2020. (nd)
May 13, 2020 Filing 1 Joint Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV14938 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6695039 issued.. Filed by BCIP Double Impact Associates, L.P., Christopher Cozzone, Bain Capital Double Impact Fund, LP, Kitchen Fund, LP, Sustainable Restaurant Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Ramfjord, Per)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lofgren v. Cozzone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCIP Double Impact Associates, L.P.
Represented By: Per A. Ramfjord
Represented By: Jordan Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kitchen Fund, LP
Represented By: Per A. Ramfjord
Represented By: Jordan Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sustainable Restaurant Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Casey M. Nokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bain Capital Double Impact Fund, LP
Represented By: Per A. Ramfjord
Represented By: Jordan Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Cozzone
Represented By: Per A. Ramfjord
Represented By: Jordan Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristofor Lofgren
Represented By: Chad M. Colton
Represented By: Stanton R. Gallegos
Represented By: Stephen F. Deatherage
Represented By: Bryana L. Blessinger
Represented By: Anthony T. Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?